Lunford v. Bannister et al
Plaintiff: |
Darren A. Lunford |
Defendant: |
Bruce Bannister, Chuck Scardin, D.W. Neven, Gary Graham and Wolff |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv00233 |
Filed: |
May 30, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Washoe |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward C. Reed |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2010 |
Filing
42
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 3/2/2010. No objections were timely filed to the 41 R & R. The 41 R & R is well taken and is APPROVED and ADOPTED. IT IS ORDERED that Ds' 37 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED on Counts I and II as to D Scardin and is DENIED on Counts I and II as to Ds Bannister, Neven, and Graham. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
|
February 11, 2010 |
Filing
41
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Recommendation: That the District Judge GRANT IN PART and DENY IN PART defendants' 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Report and Recommendation for specifics. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 02/11/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Conference. A Scheduling Order will be issued once the Defendants have answered Plaintiff's Complaint as to Counts 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 3/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
March 12, 2009 |
Filing
27
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 3/12/2009. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 20 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is APPROVED and ADOPTED. FURTHER ORD that Ds' 13 Motion for Summary Judgm ent is DENIED as to Counts 1 and 2 of the cmp and GRANTED as to the claims asserted against Ds Bannister, Scardin, and Neven in their official capacities for money damages. FURTHER ORD that P's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORD that P's 10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 13 Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Chuck Scardin, Bruce Bannister, D.W. Neven, Gary Graham, 12 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff and 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Paintiff. Objections to R&R due by 2/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 2/10/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?