Matthews v. LeGrand et al
Plaintiff: |
Felton L. Matthews, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Robert LeGrand, Joyce Thomson, Alicia Lerud and Nevada Department Of Corrections |
Case Number: |
3:2008cv00322 |
Filed: |
June 11, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Pershing |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
224
ORDER denying 212 plaintiff's Request for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision re 211 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/31/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing
159
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS the 147 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant Joseph Ferro's 62 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and plaintiff's 60 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED . Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/22/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing
147
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief and 62 Defendant Ferro's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the District Judge enter an Order GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 62 and DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief 60 . Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 8/7/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
May 12, 2009 |
Filing
117
ORDER granting 116 Defendant's Emergency Request to Appear Telephonically at the May 26, 2009 Hearing. Counsel for Defendant shall contact the courtroom deputy, Jennifer Cotter, at (775) 686-5758, two days in advance of the hearing to advise her of the telephone number where she may be reached for the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 5/12/2009. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?