April 12, 2016 |
Filing
262
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - In accordance with the terms of the class action settlement approved by the Court in these related actions each and every action captioned here and each and every claim alleged in each such action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs and expenses of litigation including attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
260
ORDER - Anticipating the agreed upon global settlement in this class action and the dismissal of the FTCA cases, the following motions to set trial are denied without prejudice:Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG (#882)Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation, 3:08-0285-LDG (#478)Adamson v. United States, 3:08-cv-621-LDG (#457)Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG (# 255 )Adgett v. United States Department of Interior, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG (#195)Kroshus v. United Stat es, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG (#416)Adamson v. United States Department of Interior, 3:09-cv-0715-LDG (#398)Ames v. Unites States, 3:10-cv-0463-LDG (#146)Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
258
ORDER denying the following motions:Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG Plaintiffs renewal and reinstatement of motion for summary judgment on the issue of the Bureau of Reclamations level of flows through the Truckee Ca nal (#879). Kroshus v. United States, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG Plaintiffs renewal and reinstatement of motion for summary judgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#413). The dispositive motions involving the United States are the next matters on this court's docket. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
254
ORDER - The following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Kroshus v. United States, 3:08-cv-0246-LDG Plaintiff Judy Kroshus renewal a nd reinstatement of motion for summaryjudgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#875) Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-0167-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (# 219 ) Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-0649-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#161) Kroshus v. United States, 3:09-cv-0713-LDG Plaintiffs renewal and reinstatement of moti on for summary judgment regarding the level of flows through the Truckee Canal (#409) Adamson v. United States, 3:09-cv-0715-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#170) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-0463-LDG United States motion for summary judgment regarding discretionary function immunity (#112) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
253
THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court: Adamson v. United States , 3:08-cv-00621-LDG. United States' #25 Motion to dismiss, United States&# 039; #212 Motion for summary judgment as to Ten Specific Claims, and Plaintiffs' #446 Motion to dismiss renewal and reinstatement of motions. Moore v. United States , 3:09-cv-0167-LDG. Plaintiffs' # 244 Motion to dismis s United States renewal United States' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Adgett v. United States , 3:09-cv-0649-LDG. Plaintiffs' #184 Motion to dismiss United States renewal and reinstatement of motions. Adamson v. United States , 3:09-cv-0715-LDG. Plaintiffs' #387 Motion to dismiss United State' renewal and reinstatement of motions. Ames v. United States , 3:10-cv-0463-LDG. Plaintiffs' #27 Motion to convert mo tion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment, and Plaintiff's #135 Motion to dismiss United States' renewal and reinstatement of motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 27, 2013 |
Filing
243
ORDER - The following motions are DENIED without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the court in the due course of the aforementioned proceedings: Uhouse v. Bureau of Reclamation , 3:08-cv-0285-LDG : Plaintiffs' motion to reconsider the magistrate judges order denying plaintiffs' motion to enforce settlement (#428) Adamson v. United States , 3:08-cv-0621-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (#212) Moore v. Unite d States , 3:09-cv-0167-LDG : Motion to set date for trial (# 215 ) Adgett v. United States , 3:09-cv-0649-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (#147), and Motion to set a date for trial (#157) Ada mson v. United States , 3:09-cv-0715-LDG : Motion for summary judgment as to ten specific claims (#149), and Renewed motion to dismiss claims of 168 enumerated plaintiffs as untimely (#166) Ames v. United States , 3:10-cv-0463-LDG : Motion to set a date for trial (#108) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 28, 2012 |
Filing
227
ORDER denying without prejudice 193 motion to set a trial date. Motion Hearing set for Monday, 1/14/2013, at 9:00 AM in courtroom to be determined before Judge Lloyd D. George. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/28/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
181
THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motions for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity in Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM (#127); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM ( 120 ); < u>Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM (#74); Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM (#78); and Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM (#33) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/26/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
September 23, 2011 |
Filing
180
THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS: that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus I), 3:08-cv-00246-LDG-RAM, defendant Lynon Countys #564 is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, defendant Lyo n Countys #195 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM, the United States #69 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-00649-LDG-RAM the United States #71 motion to renew and reinstate that motion is DENIED as moot; that in Kroshus v. United States (Kroshus II), 3:09-cv-00713-LDG-RAM, the United States #45 motion to dismiss duplicati ve claims by certain plaintiffs is hereby GRANTED;that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #72 and #73 motions to renew those motions are DENIED as moot; that in Adamson v. United States (Adamson II) 3:09-cv-00715-LDG-RAM, the United States #75 motion to renew that motion is DENIED as moot.
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing
178
ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss VictoriaLopez Lasane in Adgett 20 is GRANTED, and its motion to dismiss Hayley McGrath andHazyn McGrath in Adgett 20 is DENIED as moot. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS tha t the United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims in Adamson II 21 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that the United States motion to dismiss plaintiffs identified as minors in Adamson I 25 is GRANTED. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS t hat the United States motion to dismiss debtors in bankruptcy in Adamson II 23 is GRANTED as to plaintiff Jeremy Gottlieb and DENIED without prejudice as to plaintiffs James and Denise Spracklin. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
August 4, 2011 |
Filing
177
ORDER GRANTING 145 Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination and Dismissal of Claims; re 173 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
164
ORDERED that United States' motion to strike class action allegations (# 10 ) is reinstated and GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Ps' motion for class certification (# 68 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Ps' motion for leave to amend the complaint to name new plaintiffs or, in the alternative, motion to intervene (# 138 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing
149
ORDER. The following motions will be heard by the court on Monday, June 13, 2011, in Reno,Nevada, at 9:00 am in a courtroom to be determined and posted at a later date; and continued, ifnecessary, to Tuesday, June 14, 2011, at 9:00 am.Adamson v. Un ited States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#25) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#127)Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#9) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration ofissues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing)United States motion f or summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity(#120)Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#19) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (# 20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#74)Adamson v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice toreinstatement)United States motion to dismiss (#23) (de nied without prejudice to reinstatement)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#78)Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAMUnited States motion to dismiss (#15)United States motion to strike claims of prejud gement interest and attorneys fees (#17)Plaintiffs motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27)United States motion for summary judgment regarding Flood Control Act immunity (#33). ( Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Lloyd D. George.) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
April 12, 2011 |
Filing
144
ORDER. The following FTCA jurisdictional and related FTCA non-Flood Control Act motions will be heard by the court at the April 18, 2011, hearing in Reno: Adamson v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#25) (denied without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Moore v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM: United States' 9 motion to dismiss (deni ed without prejudice to reconsideration of issues on summary judgment) (reinstated for purposes of this hearing); Adgett v. United States, 3:09-cv-649-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#27) (denied without preju dice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Adamson v. U nited States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike jury demand (#20) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss duplicative claims (#21) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) United States' motion to dismiss (#23) (denied without prejudice to reinstatement) Ames v. United States, 3:10-cv-463-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to dismiss (#15) United States' motion to strike claims of prejudgement interest and attorneys fee (#17) Plaintiffs' motion to convert motion to dismiss to motion for summary judgment (#27). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 4/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
March 29, 2011 |
Filing
139
ORDER DENYING without prejudice subject to their reinstatement by the Court 68 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
March 16, 2011 |
Filing
135
ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that a video conference hearing presided over by this court in Las Vegas from Courtroom 6B at the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse to Courtroom 6 in Reno at the Bruce R. Thompson United States Courthouse and F ederal Building shall be conducted on Thursday, March 24, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. to hear arguments on the following motions:Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson I), 3:08-cv-621-LDG-RAM: United States' motion to strike class al legations (dkt #26) (denied without prejudice to subsequent reinstatement); Moore, et al. v. United States, 3:09-cv-167-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt 10 ) (denied without prejudice to rec onsideration in ruling on the motion for class certification)Plaintiffs' motion for class certification ( 68 );Adamson, et al. v. United States (Adamson II), 3:09-cv-715-LDG-RAM:United States' motion to strike class action allegations (dkt #22) (denied for case management purposes without prejudice to reinstatement). Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 3/16/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
113
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re # 112 Stipulated Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/16/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
105
ORDER that, in the interests of case management and the consolidation for oral argument of pending dispositive and consolidation motions, and pending discussion during the video conference hearing of the potential for mediation, the following motions are DENIED without prejudice to their reinstatement following the scheduling of oral argument on pending dispositive and consolidation motions: Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply 26 , and Motions to extend time regarding dispositive matter 29 & 30 are Granted. (See Attached PDF/Image for Specifics) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
|
August 13, 2010 |
Filing
96
THE COURT ORDERS that a video conference hearing on TCID's 94 Motion for mediation of all claims shall be conducted on September 15, 2010 at 1:00 PM. The parties in the captioned cases shall be present in Reno, Nevada, in a Courtroom t o be designated later by minute order, and Judge Lloyd D. George shall preside from Las Vegas, Nevada. ( See pdf Order for additional specifics ) Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 4, 2010 |
Filing
95
ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED ORDER RE: Hearing held 08/03/2010 81 Motion for Order Providing For Clawback of Information Inadvertently Disclosed. It is recognized that the prosecution and defense of these related actions will require each party to rev iew and to disclose large quantities of information and documents through the discovery process. (See Order for additional specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 08/04/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|