AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE et al v. THE STATE OF NEVADA ex rel its Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, Randy Lee Cook and Robert Lee Bianchi
Defendant: THE STATE OF NEVADA ex rel its Department of Corrections, Howard Skolnick, Carla Crevling, Pat Conmay and William Donat
Case Number: 3:2009cv00235
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Carson City
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 is GRANTED. Signed by Lance S. Wilson on 09/13/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
February 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 36 Objection, which the court will treat as an opposition, to 35 Magistrate's Order. The court having conducted its review and fully considered plaintiff's opposition, and other relevant matters of record pursuant to 28 U.S.C . Sec. 636(b)(1), concludes that the Magistrate Judge's ruling was neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law. The Magistrate Judge's order 35 will, therefore, be sustained. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff Bianchi's Motion to Extend Time to respond to 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment. ( Plaintiff Bianchi's Response due by 3/16/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/18/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE et al v. THE STATE OF NEVADA ex rel its Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE
Represented By: James Andre Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Cook
Represented By: James Andre Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Bianchi
Represented By: James Andre Boles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF NEVADA ex rel its Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Crevling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Conmay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Donat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?