Evans v. McDaniels et al
Plaintiff: Todd Evans
Defendant: EK McDaniels and Nevada Dept of Correction
Case Number: 3:2009cv00319
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: White Pine
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING 86 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING 68 Motion for subpoena duces tecum. Defense counsel's Status Report due by 6/8/2011. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/27/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/28/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Lisa Mann. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for discovery 24 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff's motion for civil process service an d amendment of defendants 26 is DENIED. The Clerk shall SEND plaintiff a form for filing civil rights complaint (sent). Plaintiff's motion for discovery 40 is STRICKEN. Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery 43 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to amend and supplemental amendment 44 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for order to protect witness 46 is DENIED.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The Court ADOPTS AND ACCEPTS the Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge 21 ; therefore, plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 9 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 15 motion for reconsideration of the court's order and 16 motion to amend the complaint are DENIED. FURTH ORD that P's failure to file with the court and serve on Ds the final pgs of his origin al complaint as ordered by this court will result in the dismissal of this action. P is granted 10 days from the date of service of this order to do so. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/11/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. McDaniels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EK McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Dept of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?