Knox v. Arguello et al
Plaintiff: Monteneque Nakia Knox
Defendant: Tania Arguello, Patrick McNamara, Tabitha Creon, Davis, James Baca, Matt Tilley, Zappatini, Shorey and Frecher
Case Number: 3:2009cv00559
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Carson City
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING the # 38 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. Therefore, Ds' # 24 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and P's # 12 complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Show Special Injury. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. on 11/1/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr, on 10/25/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Jennifer Cotter. Defendants' 25 Motion to Vacate 11/16/2010 Mediation and Stay Mediation Pending the Court's Decision on D efendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The Inmate Early Mediation Conference scheduled for 11/16/2010 at 1:30 PM is VACATED and will be reset pending a decision on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 24 if necessary. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the court affirms the 15 magistrate judge's decision to deny plaintiff's 14 motion for appointment of counsel and request for evidentiary hearing, and the plaintiff's 20 motion appealing such is DENIED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/18/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED Clerk shall FILE the complaint. FURTHER ORD the complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. FURTHER ORD P may file amended complaint by 8/22/2010. FURTHER ORD P shall title amended complaint as "FIRST AMENDED" w case number above. F URTHER ORD Clerk shall send P 1983 form w instructions, and copy of the original complaint. ( Form and copies mailed to P 7/8/2010 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/6/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Arguello et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monteneque Nakia Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tania Arguello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha Creon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zappatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?