Kirkpatrick vs Washoe County, et al.
Plaintiff: Jamie Kirkpatrick
Defendant: Washoe County and Chondra Wood
Case Number: 3:2009cv00600
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
County: Washoe
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF No. 116 Stipulation of Dismissal of this action in its entirety, and all claims against Defendant Washoe County. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Approving Compromise of Minor's Claim (see order for details), re ECF 112 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDERED that Plaintiff's # 69 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Washoe County's # 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Linda Kennedy, Amy Reynolds, and Ellen Wilcox's # 72 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 10/26/2010. IT IS, HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant's 30 is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's 40 Motion t o Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter to amend pleading is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff's 41 First Motion to Amen/Correct Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall h ave fourteen (14) days within which to file the proposed complaint. FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant Washoe County's 50 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants Linda Kennedy and Ellen Wilcox's 52 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirkpatrick vs Washoe County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Kirkpatrick
Represented By: William R Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chondra Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?