Bullion Monarch Mining, Inc. v. Barrick Goldstrike Mines, Inc. (Sub File of 3:08-cv-227-ECR-VPC)
Case Number: 3:2009cv00612
Filed: October 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER that Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 281 ) is granted; Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's motions to seal (ECF Nos. 283 , 284 , 292 ) are granted; Plaintiff will file redacted versions of the applicable documents, as Plaintiff stated in the motions to seal, by 11/17/2018; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 295 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 281 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting ECF No. 279 Joint and Stipulated Motion to Revise Briefing Schedule for Goldstrike's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 268 Order is VACATED. Goldstrike to file motion to dismiss (14) after it receives the last of the outstanding jurisdictional discovery deposition transcripts; opposition to motion to dismiss due (21) days after the motion is filed; reply due (10) days after opposed filed; Joint Status Report due by 04/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 AMENDED ORDER re 267 granting 263 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery, denying without prejudice 260 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and granting in part and denying in part 264 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Set Discovery and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 263 Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery, denying without prejudice 260 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and granting in part and denying in part 264 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings and Set Discovery and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying ECF No. 229 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Finding of Ambiguity and Stay Deadline for Submission of Pretrial Order; granting ECF No. 234 Motion to Seal and Leave to Redact opposition/response to Barrick's Motion. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Clayton Brust and Daniel Polsenberg (Present); Def Counsel: Michael Petrogeorge (Present); Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 10:07:17 a.m. - 11:27:01 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. Plaintiff's 230 Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED. The court further denies without prejudice Plaintiff's attempt in the 249 reply memorandum to have the court reopen damage discovery. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting ECF No. 239 Unopposed Motion : The November 30, 2016, deadline for the submission of a proposed pretrial order shall be and hereby is VACATED. The deadline for the submission of a proposed pretrial order shall be reset after the currently pending motions have been decided by this Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Barrick's Motion for Summary Judgment on All Claims Pursuant to the Rule Against Perpetuities 43 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Barrick's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Lack of Obligation to Plaintiff 50 is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Bullion's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 53 is DENIED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 2/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 103 Joint/Stipulated Motion for Entry of Amended Briefing Schedule. Bullion shall file an Amended Opposition to Barrick's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Amended Opposition shall be filed under seal and shall sup ersede and replace the original opposition filed 09/07/2010. Goldstrike shall file an Amended Reply to Barrick's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Amended Reply shall be filed under seal and shall supersede and replace the original repl y filed 09/24/2010. Bullion shall have until 12/28/2010 to file a supplement to the Amended Opposition which shall be filed under seal. Goldstrike shall have until 01/11/2011 to file a supplement to the Amended Reply which shall be filed under seal.The Clerk shall retrieve and destroy the original opposition (09/07/2010) and reply (09/24/2010). (See Order for specific) (Amended Responses due by 12/28/2010. Amended Replies due by 1/11/2011) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 10/25/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Colleen Larsen. The Motions are GRANTED. 57 Motion to Seal; 61 Motion for Leave to File; 62 Motion to Seal; 65 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 75 Motion to Seal; 78 Motion for Leave to File; 79 Motion for Leave to File; and, 80 Motion for Leave to File. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullion Monarch Mining, Inc. v. Barrick Goldstrike Mines, Inc. (Sub File of 3:08-cv-227-ECR-VPC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?