Thomas v. Palmer et al
Case Number: 3:2009cv00633
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 45 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Clerk shall treat motion as notice of appeal and process appeal accordingly. Motion for certificate of appealability 45 is denied to the extent that petitioner is seeking certific ate of appealability. Motion for appointment of counsel 46 is denied. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 28 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly; denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss 29 is GRANTED. Grounds 1, 2, 5, 9, 10, and 12 are DISMISSED with prejudice as procedurally defaulted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for judgment on remaining grounds 36 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer, which shall comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Gove rning Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot 9 petitioner's Motion to order respondents to submit the record of his proceedings in state court. See order re specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 respondents' Motion to Extend Time to file and serve an answer or other response to 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. ( Responses due by 2/22/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/28/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?