Huck et al v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00643 |
Filed: |
November 2, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 50 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
49
AMENDED ORDER Concerning Mediation and Interim Payments re: 46 . FURTHER ORDERED that this case is not stayed and defendants are permitted to proceed with the filings of any pleadings. FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiffs do not make the re quired payments by the dates set forth, the injunction prohibiting foreclosure will be immediately lifted, without the need of a subsequent court order, and foreclosure can commence. (See Order for specifics). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 4 Motion to Remand is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, the 5 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED, the 9 and 27 Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED as to the first cause of action, GRANTED as to the tent h through twelfth causes of action with respect to the non-MERS Defendants, DENIED as to the third and fourth causes of action, and DENIED as to the remaining causes of action for lack of jurisdiction, as these currently remain with Judge Teilborg in Case No. 2:09-md-02119-JAT in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED, Defendants will cease foreclosure proceedings for one-hundred (100) days. During this period, Plaintiffs will make full, regular monthly payments under the note every thirty ( 30) days, with the first payment due fifteen (15) days after the date of this order. Plaintiffs need not pay late fees or cure the entire amount of past default at this time. Failure to make monthly payments during the injunction period, however, w ill result in a lifting of the injunction. FURTHER ORDERED, during the injunction period Defendants will conduct a private mediation with Plaintiffs in good faith. FURTHER ORDERED, Plaintiffs will provide requested information to Defendants in advance of the mediation in good faith. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
23
ORDER STAYING CASE : All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending Judge Teilborg's (MDL) order to remand back to this Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?