Ellifritz et al v. Netbank et al
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00663 |
Filed: |
November 9, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Real Property: Foreclosure Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 15, 2012 |
Filing
59
JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED thatthe Motions to Dissolve Injunction, for Summary Judgment, and to Expunge Lis Pendens 49 50 51 and the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution 52 are GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motions to Dissolve Injunction, for Summary Judgment, and to Expunge Lis Pendens 49 50 51 and the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution 52 are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the lis pendens on the properties at 5789 West Brookdale Drive, Reno, NV. 89523 and 6540 Sage Grouse Ct., Reno, NV. 89523 are EXPUNGED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 5 Motion to Remand is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, the 6 and 17 Motion to Stay are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED, the 24 Motion to Amend is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, the 14 and {28] Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED as to the first cause of action, GRANTED as to the tenth through twelfth causes of action with respect to the non-MERS Defendants, DENIED as to the third and fourth causes of action, and DENIED as to the remaining causes of action for lack o f jurisdiction, as these currently remain with Judge Teilborg in Case No. 2:09-md-02119-JAT in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED the 34 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, Defendants will cease foreclosure proceedings f or one-hundred (100) days. During this period, Plaintiffs will make full, regular monthly payments under the note every thirty (30) days, with the first payment due fifteen (15) days after the date of this order. Plaintiffs need not pay late fees o r cure the entire amount of past default at this time. Failure to make monthly payments during the injunction period, however, will result in a lifting of the injunction. FURTHER ORDERED, during the injunction period Defendants will conduct a private mediation with Plaintiff in good faith. FURTHER ORDERED, Plaintiffs will provide requested information to Defendants in advance of the mediation in good faith. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
April 21, 2010 |
Filing
22
ORDER STAYING CASE : All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending Judge Teilborg's (MDL) order to remand back to this Court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/21/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?