Summers v. McDaniels et al
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00674 |
Filed: |
March 15, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 1, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDERED that petitioner's motion for relief from judgment pursuant to FRCP Rule 60(b) (ECF No. 42 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 27 motion to reconsider is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
May 19, 2011 |
Filing
26
JUDGMENT - The Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (# 8 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no Certificate of Appealability shall issue. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 23, 2011 |
Filing
23
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's 19 and 21 motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/23/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's 17 Motion to Abandon is GRANTED. Ground two of the 8 amended petition is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED, Respondents shall file their answer to the remaining grounds for relief in the amended petition within thirty days of entry of this Order. Thereafter, Petitioner shall have thirty days to reply. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/27/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
15
ORDER GRANTING Rs' 11 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that P shall have 30 days from entry of this order to notify the Court of intent to forever abandon ground two of the amended petition. P shall file a document entitled Declaration of I ntent to Abandon and shall outline in that declaration his intention to voluntarily abandon forever the claim presented in ground two of the amended petition. The declaration shall be signed under penalty of perjury. Failure to timely file the decla ration shall result in the petition being dismissed in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that no later than 30 days following the filing of P's Declaration of Abandonment, Rs shall file their answer to the remaining grounds for relief in the amended petition. Thereafter, P shall have 30 days to reply. ( Notice of Compliance is due by 12/18/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 11/18/2010 for spelling (DRM).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?