Western Nevada Supply Company Profit-Sharing Plan and Trust et al v. Aneesard Mgmt., LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Jack T. Reviglio, Richard J. Reviglio, Western Nevada Supply Company 401(k) Plan and Western Nevada Supply Company Profit-Sharing Plan and Trust
Defendant: Aneesard Mgmt., LLC, DN Management Company, LLC,, Barry Downs, Draseena Funds Group, Corp, Albert Gerebizza, Kenzie Financial Management, Inc.,, Walter J. Salvadore, Jr, Daniel H. Spitzer, Three Oaks Senior Strength Fund, LLC and US First Fund, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv00737
Filed: December 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER dismissing Defendant Walter J. Salvadore. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDERED that Ds' # 25 Motion to dismiss, as it relates to D Barry Downs, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: ( see pdf order for specifics ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 401(k) Plan and the Plan&Trust are dismissed as Plaintiffs against Barry Downs. The action remains stayed against Plaintiff Walter J. Salvadore, Jr. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/23/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINAL JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' 83 motion for judgment by default is GRANTED, and plaintiffs shall have judgment against each of the Seven Defendants, jointly and severally, Daniel H. Spitzer, Draseena Funds Group Co rp., Aneesard Mgmt, LLL., U.S. First Fund, LLC., Three Oaks Senior Strength Fund, LLC., Kenzie Financial Management, Inc., and DN Management Company, LLC. Plaintiffs are awarded judgment against the Seven Defendants with respect to losses to the 401 (k) Plan assets in the amount of $2,972,633.87, plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $161,764; and plaintiffs are awarded judgment against the Seven Defendants with respect to the losses to the Profit Sharing Plan & Trust assets in th e amount of $500,000, plus pre-judgment interest in the amount of $27,209. Plaintiffs Final Judgment by Default does not resolve the claims against Barry Downs or Walter Salvadore. (See Judgment for specifics) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 1/27/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING without prejudice 25 Motion to Dismiss with respect to Ds Aneesard Mgmt., LLC, Draseena Funds Group, Corp., Three Oaks Senior Strength Fund, LLC, US First Fund, LLC, Kenzie Financial Management, Inc., DN Management Company, LLC, and Daniel H. Spitzer. No ruling is made with respect to D Barry Downs. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that Ps and D Barry Downs shall by 12/20/2010, submit contemporaneous supplemental points and authorities regarding which claims in the # 1 Complaint and # 2 Motion to dismiss are relevant to Ps and Barry Downs. The parties may also address any additional issues of the liability of Barry Downs which may be relevant to the # 25 Motion to dismiss. Thereafter, the parties shall have 14 days to file resp onsive points and authorities to those filed by the opposing party. In the alternative, Ps may file an amended complaint by 12/6/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/22/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 motion for enlargement of time to serve defendant Albert Gerebizza aka Alfred Gerebizza. Plaintiffs shall have until Tuesday, July 13, 2010 to properly effect service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Nevada Supply Company Profit-Sharing Plan and Trust et al v. Aneesard Mgmt., LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aneesard Mgmt., LLC
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DN Management Company, LLC,
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Downs
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draseena Funds Group, Corp
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gerebizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenzie Financial Management, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter J. Salvadore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Spitzer
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Oaks Senior Strength Fund, LLC
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US First Fund, LLC
Represented By: Adam P Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack T. Reviglio
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Reviglio
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Nevada Supply Company 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Nevada Supply Company Profit-Sharing Plan and Trust
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?