Rowell v. Palmer et al
Case Number: 3:2010cv00044
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that petitioner's motion to deny preclusive effect to state court judgment as void and motion to set aside order denying habeas petition ECF Nos. 72 and 73 are both DENIED; a certificate of appealability is DENIED; that petitioner shall file no further documents in thisclosed case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that petitioner's motion for leave to amend and to vacate judgment ECF No. 58 , motion for evidentiary hearing ECF No. 59 , and motion or judicial notice of fraud on the court ECF No. 63 are all DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying and dismissing 50 Motion to Set Aside, as a second or successive petition pursuant to 28 USC 2244(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDERED that no Certificate of Appealability shall issue as to the Motion for Relief From Judgment; re 47 USCA Order. USCA Case No. 11-16691. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2011. ( E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit, on 7/27/2011 ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Amended Motion to Set Aside Judgment 41 is DENIED AND DISMISSED as a Second or Successive Petition pursuant to 28:2244(b)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 11 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motions for immediate release 14 17 18 21 and for expedited decision 24 are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for a copy of the doc ket sheet 19 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have thirty (30) days to file their Answer to the claim raised in the petition. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days thereafter to file the reply. (Replies due by 10/11/2010. Responses due by 9/11/2010) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/11/2010. NOTE: Clerk sent copy of PACER docket sheet to plaintiff on 8/11/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowell v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?