Miranda-Zamarron v. State Of Nevada et al
Case Number: 3:2010cv00094
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 38 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/22/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JUDGMENT - The Amended Petition is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner is DENIED A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING respondents' 33 motion for enlargement of time to file their Answer to the surviving grounds of the petition, seeking an additional forty-five (45) days. The answer shall be filed no later than 7/12/2011. Thereafter, the petitioner shall ahve thirty (30) days to file his reply. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 9 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall detach and file the Petitioner's Declaration of Election to Abaondon [sic] Claims attached to the Reply to Order 29 (Ack'd). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that grounds 2 and 3(b) of the petition are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have 30 days to file their Answer to the remaining claims for relief. Thereafter, petitioner shall have 30 days to file his reply. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically transmit the 27 letter to respondents and shall mail a copy of the Docket Sheet in this matter to petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED, respondents shall have 20 days to file their Response to this Order as directed herein.(Clerk manually sent docket sheet to P; and regenerated #27 NEF in order to comply with the directive of the court to electronically transmit the letter to respondents.) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that the motion to reconsider (# 20 ) is granted. The Order of dismissal is vacated and the Judgment recalled. FURTHER ORD that Rs shall serve P with a copy of their motion to dismiss and the supporting exhibits within ten days of entry of t his order and shall file proof of said service with the Clerk of Court. FURTHER ORD that the motion for time to file a response to the motion to dismiss (# 21 ) is granted. The response shall be filed within 45 days of the date of service indicated on the Certificate of Service filed pursuant to this Order. Thereafter, Rs shall have fifteen days to reply. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/15/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The 7 petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 9 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. The petition is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/18/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda-Zamarron v. State Of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?