Rowell v. Palmer et al
Case Number: 3:2010cv00098
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - Petitioner's motion for merits decision (ECF No. 67 ) is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner's motion for oral argument (ECF No. 68 ) is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDERED that petitioner's motion to deny preclusive effect to state court judgment as void (ECF No. 62 ) is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner\'s motion to set aside order denying habeas petition (ECF No. 63 ) is DENIED. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying with prejudice 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. No certificate of appealability shall issue. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 22 motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. FURTH ORD that P's 25 motion for judgment is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowell v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?