Funches v. McDaniel et al
Case Number: 3:2010cv00127
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON 66 STIPULATION, Dismissing Case with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 32 is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED. Defenadant's Motion to Dismiss 17 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/16/2011. IT IS ORDERED that the court grants P's 24 motion for permission to file an amended opposition to Ds' 17 motion to dismiss. FURTH ORD that Ds shall file a reply to P's amended opposition within 7 days of the date of this order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING the 19 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or for Preliminary Injunction 10 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall FILE the Complaint [1-2] (ack'd). FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's first, second, and third claims for relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's fourth claim for relief states a colora ble Eighth Amendment claim based on conditions of confinement. All other claims within the fourth claim for relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiff's fifth claim for relief states a Fourteenth Amendment equal protection claim based on di scriminatory treatment and a due process claim in connection with his disciplinary hearing. All other claims within the fifth claim for relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this or der, along with a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, to the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada (ack'd). The Attorney General shall advise the court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order whether they can ac cept service of process for the named defendants and the last known address under seal of the defendants for which they cannot accept service. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any of the defendants, such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within thirty (30)days of the date of the notice of acceptance of service. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties SHALL DETACH, COMPLETE, AND FILE the attached Notice of Intent to Proceed with Mediatio n form on or before thirty (30) days from the date of the entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve upon defendant(s) a copy of every pleading. (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funches v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?