Jones v. Skolnik et al
Defendant: Greg Cox, Yaqub Mustafaa, Howard Skolnik and Brian Williams
Case Number: 3:2010cv00162
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting ECF No. 652 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER that plaintiff's objections ECF No. 645 and defendants' objections ECF No. 643 to Second Amended Report and Recommendation are OVERRULED; Second Amended Report and Recommendation ECF No. 642 is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 598 is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion to exclude evidence or, alternatively, to strike exhibits ECF No. 617 is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion to strike ECF No. 628 is GRANTED; Defendants' motion for summary judgment ECF No. 608 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 603 Motion for Clarification : The deadline to file and serve any points and authorities in response to a motion for summary judgment is 21 days after service of the motion. Moreover, the defendants requested and were granted until October 31, 2017 to file an opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 598 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER denying ECF No. 592 Motion for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/13/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Request to Take Notice of Automatic Substitution Pursuant to FRCP 25(d) is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting ECF No. 588 Unopposed Motion to Excuse the Participation of Jared M. Frost at the July 2017 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ECF No. 579 ).The court will DEFER its decision on Plaintiff's Motion to attend in person (ECF No. 580 ).Defendants' Motion to excuse participation in the settlement conference (ECF No. 581 ) is GRANTED in part. Defendant Isidro Baca shall be required to attend in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER the Attorney Generals Office shall direct an investigator to review the ex-felon registry and provide the same limited information to plaintiff for Jose Alcocer and Isidro Lemus-Leon no later than Friday, October 7, 2016. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel ECF No. 506 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 09/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER denying 535 defendants' motion to appear in Las Vegas District Court for settlement conference. The court does not have an additional location and staff available in the Las Vegas Division to meet this accommodation. If defendants Mus tafaa and Berry are unable to find a location at SDCC to appear by telephone, perhaps an option might be to appear by telephone from the Las Vegas Office of the Attorney General. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER directing the AG's Office to make arrangements for Plaintiff to appear in person for the 9/12/2016 settlement conference in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDERED that Plaintiff's # 453 Motion for an Order Directing Defendants to Answer is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER - Defendants' # 446 Motion to Hold Order # 445 Denying Stay in Abeyance pending the Ninth Circuit's decision regarding Defendants' motion to stay is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER denying Defendants' 434 Motion to Stay; granting Plaintiff's 432 Motion for Order Directing an Answer. Defendants Skolnik, Cox, and Williams to answer 16 First Amended Complaint within 21 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 443 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/21/2015, denying 430 Motion to Submit Case to the Federal Pro Bono Pilot Project; granting 437 Motion for Leave to File Addendum; directing Clerk to detach and file the addendum. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER overruling 425 Objections, adopting and accepting 423 Report and Recommendation, denying 387 Motion to Dismiss and Request to Stay Discovery, denying 414 Motion to Dismiss, and denying 415 Motion to Stay Further Discovery. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 4/30/2015, denying Plaintiff's 426 Motion to Disregard Defendants' 425 Late Objection. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER denying 391 , 412 , and 417 Motions to Strike; and granting 403 Motion to Extend Time. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting 366 Motion for Reconsideration; vacating 363 Order; sustaining 289 Objection, to the extent this order revives it; granting 374 Renewed Motion to Strike; striking 253 Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Admissions. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 12/12/2014, denying 392 motion to stay deadline for opposition re 387 MOTION to Dismiss. (Responses due by 12/22/2014. Replies due by 1/2/2015.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER DENYING # 375 Motion to shorten time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDERED that Jones' # 354 Objection is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORD that Defendants' # 355 Objection is OVERRULED. FURTHER ORD that Jones' # 358 Motion for Expedited Ruling is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORD that Jones' # 367 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER overruling 289 Objection. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER overruling 324 Objection. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 316 motion for order; denying 317 motion to compel; denying 320 motion not to reopen discovery; denying as moot 329 motion for clarification; granting 349 motion to strike - Plaintiff' s 342 notice shall be stricken; denying as moot 335 motion to strike "new material"; granting as follows 334 motion for reasonable expenses: within 30 days defendants shall deposit $100 in plaintiff's inmate trust account; granting 347 motion to strike - Plaintiff's 343 response shall be stricken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDERED that Jones' # 264 Motion for Adverse Inference Instruction Due to Spoilation of Relevant Evidence is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 319 Motion to Stay deadline to file dispositive motions until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDERED : Defendant's # 279 Motion for protective order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth herein. Mustafaa SHALL RESPOND to RFA #s 98, 99, 103, 106, 118, 119, and 120 by 6/27/2014. Plaintiff's # 281 Motion to co mpel discovery is DENIED. Defendant's # 284 Motion for protective order is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's # 293 Motion to compel is GRANTED. Berry shall respond to the interrogatory as set forth herein by 6/27/2014. Plaintiff's # 302 Motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER overruling 229 Defendants' Objection re 225 Order and denying Defendants' Request to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/13/2014, denying 292 Motion to Stay and granting 290 , 299 , 305 , and 306 Motions to Extend Time. The court will extend deadline to file dispositive motions to and including 7/18/2014. Replies re 279 / 296 Motion for Protective Order due 5/16/2014. Please see attached for additional details and deadlines. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying 239 Motion to Compel; denying 253 Motion to determine sufficiency of admissions; denying 258 Motion to Strike; denying 260 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/22/2014, denying 237 Motion for Expedited Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Relief from 15 Order. Clerk shall electronically serve copy of order and copy of amended complaint 16 on AG's Office, attn Kat Howe (served via NEF/NEF regeneration 12/10/13). AG's Of fice to file notice re acceptance of service as to Williams, Cox, and Skolnik within 21 days (see attached for further details). Answer due within 30 days for any represented defendants. Henceforth, plaintiff to serve defendants copy of all pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 10/7/2013. P's motions to stay discovery (# 196 & # 201 ) are DENIED. The hearing set for Thursday, October 10, 2013 is hereby VACATED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER adopting and accepting 200 Report and Recommendation and denying 161 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/7/2013, GRANTING Plaintiff's 184 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and 198 Motion to Strike. The Clerk shall STRIKE defendants' 194 response. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING nunc pro tunc Plaintiff's 151 Motion to Extend Time; OVERRULING Plaintiff's 152 Objections; DENYING as moot Defendants' 155 Motion. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Objection 133 and Plaintiff's Objection 134 are DENIED. The Magistrate Judge's Order (130) is AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 142 is DENIED as moot.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 7/17/2012 to clarify document number. (MLC).
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's 109 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED, and Defendants' 39 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED as follows: (1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss count III against Defendant Berry and count IV against Defendant Thackwell is GRANTED, and these claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; (2) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss count I and count IV against Defendant Berry is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 110 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED. Defendant's 44 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claim in Count V is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Defendant Mason. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 104 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 Motion to reissue summons. The Clerk shall shall RE-ISSUE summons to Jeremiah Schultz and Aaron Landis and MAIL the summons to plaintiff. ( Summons Re-Issued and Mailed to P on 1/26/2012. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER adopting in part 72 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Partial Objections 79 to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 72 is hereby sustained, and the matter is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for reconsideration of Defendants' Motion to DismissCount V 44 against Defendant Melanie Mason. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in all other respects the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 72 is adopted and accepted, as follows: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count V 44 against Defendant Janet Traut is GRANTED, and Count V against Defendant Traut is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/11/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's objection 75 to the Magistrate Judge'sorder is OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's order 70 denying Plaintiff's motion to strike is AFFIRMED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/5/2012 GRANTING P's # 74 Request for publication and request for extension of time to complete service. P shall publish the summons for Ds Jeremiah Shultz and A aron Landis in the Las Vegas Review Journal once a week for a period of 4 weeks. At the end of said period, P shall file an affidavit or proof of publication from the newspaper certifying completion of publication. P shall bear the cost of service by publication and shall be responsible for making all arrangements for publication through Mr. John McCormick. Neither NDOC nor the Office of the Attorney General shall bear any cost or responsibility for publication of the summons. In addition, the Clerk shall SEND via U.S. Mail, a copy of this order, the summons (# 29 ) and the amended complaint (# 16 ) to the above-listed Ds at their last-known addresses provided under seal (# 26 ). ( Docs mailed 1/6/2012.) The deadline to complete service of process on Ds Jeremiah Shultz and Aaron Landis is hereby extended to Wednesday, February 29, 2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 1/5/2012 to correct mailing date (DRM).
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 10/25/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Lisa Mann. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to strike 54 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to strike 58 defendants' opposition and defendants' motion for leave to file a surreply 64 are DENIED AS MOOT. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that P's # 31 motion to challenge errors in order # 24 " is DENIED. The dismissal with prejudice of Claims 2 and 6 of the amended complaint, as determined in the Court's December 28, 2010 order, remains in effect. FURT HER ORDERED P's # 32 Motion to affix exhibits is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court SHALL ATTACH to the # 16 Amended complaint the Exhibits found at ECF No. 6 -2. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion to affix exhibits from original pleading (# 1 ) to amended pleading (# 16 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/9/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORD Clerk shall issue summons for Jeremiah Schultz and Aaron Landis and send same to USM w the addresses provided under seal. Clerk shall send P 2 copies USM-285 form, 2 copies of the # 16 Complaint, and 2 copies of this order for the defendants. P shall deliver said docs to USM by Tuesday, March 1, 2011. ( Forms, complaints, and 2 cps Order mailed to P on 2/11/2011. ) P's request for Ds' dates of birth is DENIED. P's # 27 Motion for contempt of court is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/10/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's 20 motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Skolnik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: Rona-Kaye Tuitele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaqub Mustafaa
Represented By: Rona-Kaye Tuitele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnik
Represented By: Rona-Kaye Tuitele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Rona-Kaye Tuitele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?