Wilcox v. Koehn et al
Plaintiff: David Wilcox
Defendant: Michael B. Koehn, Gregory Martin, E.K. McDaniels and Howard Skolnik
Case Number: 3:2010cv00289
Filed: May 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the failure of plaintiff to comply with the court's 7 order to file a completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis with required financial documents. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the failure of plaintiff to comply with this court's 7 order to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED, the fo llowing motions: 1 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 3 motion for appointment of counsel, and 6 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, are all DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED, the Clerk shall ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk SHALL SEND P a non-prisoner ifp w/instr (sent on 8/10/2010). W/in 30 days of entry of this order, SHALL FILE a completed and signed ifp w/required financial docs. P's failure to comply w/this order may result in the immediate dismissal of this entire action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 8/9/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, the Clerk SHALL SEND plaintiff the approved form for an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a prisoner, along with the instructions. (Sent: 7/26/2010.) Within thirty Plaintiff SHALL FILE a completed , signed application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with all required financial documentation, on the form provided by this Court. Plaintiff's failure to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis in compliance with this order may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/26/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Koehn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?