Bergna v. Benedetti et al
Petitioner: |
Peter M. Bergna |
Respondent: |
James Benedetti and Nevada Attorney General |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00389 |
Filed: |
June 28, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
63
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying in its entirety ECF No. 55 Amended Petition; denying a certificate of appealability; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDERED that by 5/15/2014 petitioner shall file a verification of the current # 55 Amended petition as outlined in the text of this order. FURTHER IS ORDERED that by 6/14/2014 respondents shall file an answer to all remaining claims on the meri ts, including Grounds 1, 3 and 4, along with any further associated briefing as to the procedural default defense raised as to those claims. See # 40 , at 4-6 & 11. FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the answer within which to file a reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
54
ORDERED that Leah Wigren, Esq., is appointed as counsel for petitioner. FURTHER ORD P shall have until up to and including 3/16/2014 to file an amended petition and/or seek other appropriate relief. FURTHER ORD that P may incorporate, in whole or in part, the current # 13 Amended petition and exhibits by reference, Local Rule LR 15-1(a) notwithstanding. FURTHER ORD that any additional state court record exhibits filed herein by either P or Rs shall be filed as specified herein. The hard copy of any exhibits filed by either counsel shall be delivered to the Clerk's office in Las Vegas. The Clerk shall: (a) regenerate notices of electronic filing to replacement counsel for all prior filings; and (b) SEND a copy of this or der to Mr. Bergna and to the CJA Coordinator.( Regenerated NEFs #1 - #53 to Attorney Leah Wigren on 9/17/2013; Order mailed to P at NNCC 9/17/2013; NEF to CJA Coordinator on 9/17/2013.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing
53
ORDER granting 46 Motion to Disqualify. Appointment of FPD, appearing through Megan Hoffman, Esq., is VACATED. Clerk shall forward this order to CJA Coordinator to identify replacement panel attorney. Please see attached for details. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
November 14, 2012 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting 41 Motion to Extend Time and 42 Motion for Partial Dismissal. Ground 9 ABANDONED. Respondents shall have 45 days to answer petition 13 . Petitioner shall have 45 days after service of answer to file and serve reply. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?