Cortinas v. State Of Nevada
Petitioner: Armando B. Cortinas, Jr.
Respondent: Nevada, State Of
Case Number: 3:2010cv00439
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - The Amended Petition (ECF No. 6 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted a Certificate of Appealability for Ground 1. A Certificate of Appealability is denied as to Petitioner's remaining grounds. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Petitioner's ECF No. 48 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 45 Answer to ECF No. 6 Amended Petition: Reply due by 1/19/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Motion for Extension of Time to file reply to ECF No. 45 Answer to ECF No. 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Reply due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Motion for enlargement of time to file answer or other response to ECF No. 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent's answer/response due 11/8/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that Respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 41 ) is GRANTED. Respondents shall have until November 1, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to the amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 6 ) in this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that the Clerk shall REOPEN this action; all filings in these consolidated cases shall be in the base case, Case No. 3:10-cv-00439-LRH-WGC, and shall bear Case No. 3:10-cv00439-LRH-WGC; that petitioner's motion to amend ECF No. 5 is GRAN TED IN PART and the amended petition filed on 03/22/2017 ECF No. 6 will be the operative petition; petitioner's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 22 is GRANTED; respondents shall file a response to the amended petiti on by 09/15/2018; that any state court record and related exhibits filed herein by either petitioner or respondents shall be filed with a separate index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number (please see Order for specific details and information). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Unopposed motion for enlargement of time to file response to ECF No. 30 Supplemental Brief in support of motion for leave to file an amended petition. Response due by 6/5/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that respondents' unopposed motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 33 ) is granted. Respondents must file a response to petitioner's supplemental brief in support of his motion for leave to file an amended petition (ECF No. [30) by 5/29/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting ECF No. 28 Petitioner's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to file supplemental brief. Supplemental Brief due by 3/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Motion for an extension of time to file supplemental brief. Supplemental brief due by 2/12/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting ECF No. 24 Motion for Access. Clerk directed to unseal non-public entry dated 3/23/17. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that petitioner shall file a supplemental brief by 12/14/2017 setting forth all arguments and evidence as indicated in this order; granting ECF No. Motion for Appointment of Counsel to Represent Petitioner; FPD will present petitioner in all federal proceedings related to this matter; granting ECF Nos. 15 Motion to Seal and 18 Motion to partially waive Local Rule IA 10-3(e) to the extent it requires descriptors of each exhibit on its cover sheet. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortinas v. State Of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Armando B. Cortinas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?