Turner, Jr. v. McDaniel et al
Petitioner: James J. Turner, Jr.
Respondent: E.K. McDaniel and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2010cv00631
Filed: October 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Clerk shall update docket to reflect that Renee Baker is substituted for E.K. McDaniel. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 7 is DENIED. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Petitioner is DENIED certificate of appealability. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/13/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion to Substitute Party. Renee Baker substituted for E.K. McDaniel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's motion for enlargement of time(second request) 17 is GRANTED. Respondents shall have through 11/28/2011 to file and serve a reply to the answer 13 . (Replies due by 11/28/2011.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER finding as moot 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; clerk shall file & serve petition; grounds 1-10, 12-15, 18, 20-37, 40, 44, 46 DISMISSED; Answering brief due by 3/7/2011.; Attorney Catherine Cortez-Masto for Nevada Attorney General added. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, petitioner shall file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account. Clerk shall send petitioner a blank application wi th instructions. (Sent: 10/21/2010.) Alternatively, petitioner shall pay the filing fee of $5.00, accompanied by a copy of this order. Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date that this order is entered to comply. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/20/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner, Jr. v. McDaniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E.K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James J. Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?