United States of America v. $102,836.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $102,836.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2010cv00682
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED that the United States' # 33 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of the United States and against Claimant Cruz. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying Cruz's 27 Motion to Suppress. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING the United States' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties shall submit a pretrial order within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR SUMMONS AND WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM FOR PROPERTY re 2 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/2/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $102,836.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $102,836.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?