Kamedula v. Dixon et al
Plaintiff: |
Brian Kamedula |
Defendant: |
Todd Dixon and Kathy Ann King |
Case Number: |
3:2010cv00749 |
Filed: |
December 2, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Edward C. Reed |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
25
ORDERED that this court CERTIFIES that any in forma pauperis appeal from its Order dated May 24, 2011 (docket # 19 ) would not be taken "in good faith" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); Re: 24 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 6/8/2011. ( E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit on 6/9/2011 re USCA Case Number 11-16349 ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
20
JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for Judge to rule on Objection to Magistrate's Screening Order 14 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Objection to Screening Order 5 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is given an extension to file his amended complaint. He shall file his amended complaint, if any, within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order.(Amended Complaint deadline: 5/6/2011.) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file his amended complaint, in conformance with this court's 3 Screening Order. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff is expressly warned that failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this entire action. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's 8 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED as moot. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/23/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?