August 13, 2013 |
Filing
148
ORDER denying 108 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
147
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/1/2013, DENYING Plaintiff's 144 Motion to Stay. The hearing scheduled for August 8, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. will address Plaintiff's 143 Motion for Sanctions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
May 8, 2013 |
Filing
121
MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff's # 118 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Final Judgment. is GRANTED. Plaintiff's # 113 Motion for Final Judgment is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/8/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER adopting and accepting 95 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 84 Defendant Prince's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 67 Motio n to Strike, 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and 91 Motion to Strike. Parties shall have 30 days to submit proposed joint pre-trial order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing
81
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/14/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. As reflected on the docket, defendant Thomas Prince was served on June 24, 2012, and the return of service was executed and filed on July 23, 2012. Defendant Prince answered the amended complaint on July 30, 2012. Therefore, Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Inquiry is DENIED AS MOOT. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
59
ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Final Judgment 49 is DENIED. As a result, Plaintiff's Motion For a Stay 54 is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing
57
MINUTE ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue a Summons for Defendant ThomasPrince and send the same to the U.S. Marshal with the address provided under seal 51 (Ack'd). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send to Plaintiff a USM-285 form, a copy of the Amended Complaint 48 , and a copy of this Order (Sent). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order within which to complete the USM-285 form and return it along with other necessary documents to the United States Marshal for service. After Plaintiff receives information from the Marshal regarding whether or not Defendant Prince has been served, Plaintiff shall file a Notice, forthwith, informing the court o f the status of that service. IT IS SO ORDERED. Notice of Compliance is due by 4/1/2012.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) Modified on 3/12/2012 to reflect title of Order. (MLC).
|
January 30, 2012 |
Filing
47
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1)Plaintiff's 24 motion to exceed the page limit for his amended complaint is GRANTED. (2) Plaintiff's 24 motion for leave to amend is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: (a )Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend to add a claim for denial of this First Amendment right to the free exercise of religion as to Thomas Prince; (b) Plaintiff is DENIED to amend with respect to his request to: (i)add an equal protection clai m against Thomas Prince; and (ii) add equal protection and civil conspiracy claims against Baker, McNeely, and Willis. (3) The Clerk shall detach and FILE the Amended Complaint. (4) The Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this o rder, along with a copy of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, on the Office of the AG of the State of NV, attn. Pamela Sharp. (5)The AG's Office shall advise the court within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order whether they can accep t service of process for Thomas Prince, or provide the last known address, under seal, of Thomas Prince if they cannot accept service. If the AG accepts service of process for Thomas Prince, he and the existing Defendants shall file and serve an answer or other response to the Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of the notice of acceptance of service of Thomas Prince. If the Attorney General does not accept service of process for Thomas Prince, the existing Defendants shall file and serve an answer or other response to the Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing of the last known address of Thomas Prince. (6) If service cannot be accepted for Thomas Prince, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifyin g Thomas Prince, requesting issuance of a summons to the address filed under seal by the AG. (7) In view of the court's order granting leave to amend in part, the following motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as moot: defendants' 17 motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment; Plaintiff's 37 motion for sanctions re defendants' reply brief; plaintiff's 38 motion to strike defendants' reply brief; plaintiff's 40 motion requesting the court to modify and allow additional pages to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment; Defendants' 44 motion to strike plaintiff's motion with de claration to support plaintiff's reply to defendants' opposition to plaintiffs declaration for (27) exhibits within plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing
34
ORDER GRANTING Ds' # 29 Motion to Strike. Clerk shall STRIKE and RETURN P's surreply # 28 Motion. ( doc rtnd to P 9/21/2011 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/21/2011 for spelling (DRM).
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing
14
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to strike any defendant response and request for court to grant original motion 10 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 4/18/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
April 6, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion-request rehearing for screening order dismissal of Fourteenth Amendment claim 8 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|