Knight v. Climbing Magazine et al
Plaintiff: |
Brian Knight |
Defendant: |
Climbing Magazine, Mark Crowther , NY, SKRAM Media, LLC, Matt Samet , CO and Cedar Wright , CO |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00146 |
Filed: |
March 1, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault Libel & Slander |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
75
ORDER DISMISSING CASE in its entirety. Defendant's 64 Motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's fourth cause of action for appropriation of publicity is DISMISSED. Defendant's 73 Motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
December 18, 2012 |
Filing
62
ORDERED that Ds' # 56 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED in-part and DENIED in-part. ( see pdf order for specifics ) FURTHER ORD P's # 60 Motion to strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing
54
ORDERED that D's # 46 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED. P's # 24 Amended complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that P shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 20, 2011 |
Filing
49
ORDERED that D's # 42 Motion to strike is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall STRIKE P's # 41 Notice to the court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 8, 2011 |
Filing
44
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's 26 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days after entry of this order to effectuate service upon defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
September 14, 2011 |
Filing
38
ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
13
ORDERED that Ds' # 8 Brief concerning removal is GRANTED. Accordingly, the court shall accept Ds' removal of this action and exercise diversity jurisdiction over the complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Climbing Magazine is granted twenty (20) days to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted ten (10) days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?