Gibson et al v. Fieldstone Mortgage Company et al
Plaintiff: Edward Branford Gibson and Nicole Lynette Gibson
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Quicken Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, N.A., Stewart Title Company, Title Source, Inc., Fieldstone Mortgage Company and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 3:2011cv00176
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss : P's 1st, 2nd, and 3rd causes of action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. As to 4th cause of action the Court DISMISSES all Defendants not involved in the loan origination - that is, every Defendant except for Fieldstone and Quicken. (see pdf order for specifics) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 9/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDERED that Ps' # 21 Motion to Extend Time to Amend is GRANTED. Ps shall have 14 days within which to file an amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Ps' # 21 Motion to Add Indispensable Party is DENIED without prejudice because there is currently no complaint in this case. If Ps wish to add parties, they should include them in the amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Ds' # 22 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 1/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED Ps' # 21 Motion to add indispensable party is DENIED without prejudice. In light of this ruling, Ds' # 22 Motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Ps' # 21 Motion for an extension to file an amended complaint is GRANTED. Ps shall file an amended complaint on or before Monday, December 12, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/5/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) (Main Document 28 replaced on 12/5/2011) (DRM).
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that Ds MERS, BAC, and ReconTrust's # 7 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Ps shall have until 11/2/2011 to file an amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Ds' # 7 Motion to expunge the lis pendens recorded on the property is DENIED, as there still exists an action affecting title or possession of the property. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 10/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. Fieldstone Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Christina S Bhirud
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Christina S Bhirud
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Title Source, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldstone Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Christina S Bhirud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Branford Gibson
Represented By: Rick Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lynette Gibson
Represented By: Rick Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?