Noguera v. Smith et al
Petitioner: Carlos Noguera
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Greg Smith
Case Number: 3:2011cv00428
Filed: June 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing respondents to file an answer to 6 petition within 45 days. Petitioner shall file and serve a reply within 45 days of the answer. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to the staff attorneys in Reno. Answer due 8/22/2014. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED the # 9 Motion for relief from judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORD the # 11 Motion to Dismiss the Petition is GRANTED. The petition is DISMISSED. No Certificate of Appealability shall issue.. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 12/13/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED Clerk shall FILE and E-serve the petition (# 1 -1) and the motion for appointment of counsel (# 1 -2) upon Rs. ( E-service of Order, Petition, and Motion, upon AG performed on 7/19/2011 ) FURTHER ORD the motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. FURTHER ORD Rs' answer/response to petition due by 9/2/2011. FURTHER ORD henceforth P shall serve AG with a copy of every document submitted for consideration by the Court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noguera v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Noguera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?