Western Highland Mortgage Fund I, LLC v. Tahoe Regional Planning Agency et al
Plaintiff: |
Western Highland Mortgage Fund I, LLC |
Defendant: |
Tahoe Regional Planning Agency, Rockwell Lot, LLC, Chad R. Smittkamp, CitiMortgage Inc and Jean Merkleback |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00444 |
Filed: |
June 22, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert A. McQuaid |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
186
ORDER denying 147 Motion for Relief under Rule 36(b). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
April 25, 2014 |
Filing
172
ORDER Re Award of Expenses for Discovery Violation. Defendant Jean Merkelbach, individually, and as Trustee of the Rockwell 1997 Trust and as Trustee of the SES Trust, Rockwell Lot, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, is ordered to reimb urse Plaintiff Fidelity National Title Insurance Company the sum of $2,607.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
165
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 148 Motion to Compel. Fidelity shall submit within ten days declaration substantiating its request for reimbursement of fees and expenses in connection with bringing this motion to compel. Mer kelbach's response due within seven days of declaration. Reply due within five days of response, if any. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing
164
ORDER Merkelbach's request that the admissions be withdrawn (set forth in 142 MOTION for Relief) is granted. The admissions are therefore withdrawn. Merkelbach shall provide responses to the requests for admission within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
141
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
111
OORDERED that the # 102 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 94 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 7, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDERED that the TRPA's # 38 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: Merkelbachs # 24 Cross-claim is dismissed, but WHMF-I's claims for declaratory relief are not dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that CitiMortgage's # 40 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 8/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing
58
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 11/28/2011. IT IS ORDERED that the 57 "Joint Request for Stay of Discovery Pending Decisions on the Motions" (motions 38 and 40 ) is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?