Garcia v. Regional Trustee Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Garcia
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Regional Trustee Services Corporation and First Horizon Home Loans Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00470
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT: Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety with prejudice. There are no remaining claims in this case. Any notice of lis pendens that may be filed on the property at issue is CANCELLED and EXPUNGED. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 07/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the amended motion to remand 24 is DENIED. The original motion to remand 20 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss 27 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART: Plaintiff's first cause of action for violations of TILA, third cause of action for debtcollection violations, fourth cause of action for unfair and deceptive trade practices, fifth cause of action for quiet title, and eighth cause of action for wrongful foreclosure to cancel trustee's deed are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the remaining claims are not dismissed. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 8/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that P's 5 Motion for Stay is DENIED. The issues which are being submitted to the Nevada Supreme Court are irrelevant to the issues now before this Court. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 8/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Regional Trustee Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Garcia
Represented By: Terry J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Joe Solseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corporation
Represented By: Joe Solseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Horizon Home Loans Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?