Manley v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Charles Manley
Defendant: Glenn Hammock, Cameron Horsley, Scott Manning, Nevada, State Of, Officer Michael Rowley and Alan Zimmer
Case Number: 3:2011cv00636
Filed: September 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/20/2017, granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 299 Motion for Status Conference, to be scheduled by the courtroom administrator as soon as the Court's calendar will accommodate it. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 283 Report and Recommendation; granting 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 254 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 247 Motion for Extension of Time; directing Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting 252 Motion to File Exhibit C1 Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 223 , 240 , 262 , and 276 Objections. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER re motions ruled upon during 7/24/2014 hearing : 1. Plaintiff's # 251 Motion to Hold Defendants Counsel in Contempt and an Order Imposing Sanctions Against the Defendants is DENIED; 2. Plaintiff's # 263 Motion for Order Transcribing the May 16, 2014, Court Hearing is DENIED; and 3. Defendants' # 258 Motion to Seal Doc. # 257 Response to Motion, Exhibits B and D is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying 207 Objections re 206 Minutes. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 241 Motion for Teleconference. The courtroom deputy is directed to schedule a discovery conference as soon as the court's calendar will permit. Defendants directed to file a response re 242 MOTION for a Court Order Extending the NDOC Copywork Limit (3rd Request) prior to the teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying 170 and 224 Motions; denying as moot 186 Supplement to Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion, 177 Supplement to Motion to Compel, and 189 Motion. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/27/2014, denying 217 Motion for Court Order to Extend NDOC Copy Work Limit. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 11/21/2013, granting Plaintiff's 158 Motion to Withdraw, therefore denying as moot 146 and 147 motions; granting Defendants' 164 Request for Status Conference. The motion hearing scheduled for 11/25/2013 will also address the matters outlined in Defendants' 164 request. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion for Court Order to Conduct Depositions of Each Defendant by Remote or Alternative Means. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 128 Motion to Compel AG to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING 140 & 141 MotionS to Extend Time : 1. Defendants shall have an enlargement of time up to and including October 28, 2013, within which to submit their responses to Plaintiff's second set of interrogatories to Defendant Rowley; and, 2. Defendants shall have an extension of time to and including November 5, 2013, within which to file their reply to the Plaintiff's 133 opposition to Defendants' # 122 Motion for partial dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER overruling Defendants' objections to requests 2, 9 and 10 re 48 MOTION to Compel. Defendants ordered to file under seal on or before 10/25/2013 redacted versions of the documents indicated in attached order. Defendants shal l produce the redacted versions for Plaintiff's review on or before 11/1/2013. Plaintiff is not permitted to physically possess documents in his cell but should kite warden to review them. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER - Defendants' # 127 Motion is GRANTED in part. Should this court enter a report and recommendation recommending denial of Defendants' # 122 Partial Motion to Dismiss, then Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's discove ry shall be due 30 days from the date of that report and recommendation. Conversely, if this court recommends granting Defendants' motion, then responses to Plaintiff's discovery will continue to be stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DOCKET ERROR - DUPLICATE RE 110 - DISREGARD THIS ENTRY: ORDER GRANTING IN PART 99 Motion to Amend Complaint : Amended Complaint is due by 7/17/2013. Plaintiff is not permitted to add any other claims or defendants other than as permitted in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 7/3/2013 to denote duplicate; NEF regenerated to counsel (DRM).
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT P's ## 28 , 30 , 39 Motions. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/16/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. Plaintiff is advised he should not expect to receive free copies of the docket sheet and/or additional copies of court fil ings as a matter of course. plaintiff's request shall be granted on a one-time basis. Plaintiff's motion 42 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of the docket sheet in this matter to the plaintiff (Sent). As to plaintiff's motion for an extension of the discovery deadline 43 , the court will defer ruling on this motion until the court receives and reviews the defendants' response to the motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/7/2012 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition of Incarcerated Person 29 is GRANTED. Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of the deposition at Defendants' expense. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/28/2012. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's 21 motion is denied as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. This case will bot be referred for formal mediation. The Court encourages the parties to engage in informal discussions in an effort to settle this case. For this reason, a courtesy copy of this order a nd the complaint shall be provided to defendants' counsel by the Clerk. (Electronically served on 10/31/2011, see NEF for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manley v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Hammock
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Horsley
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Manning
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Rowley
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Zimmer
Represented By: Roger R Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?