Downs v. River City Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Downs
Defendant: MTC FINANCIAL INC., dba TRUSTEE CORPS, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, River City Group LLC and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2011cv00885
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER that sealed portion of 363 Minutes be unsealed for purpose of preparing transcript. Donnal Davidson shall prepare transcript and deliver to plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for fees. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 281 motion in limine to exclude other litigation, complaints, investigations, settlements, or other unrelated matters; denying 299 motion in limine to exclude Beverly Paschal's and Dr. Richard Harris' testimony; denying 302 motion in limine to exclude expert Thomas Tarter. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER directing Minnesota Life to retrieve from chambers the materials it submitted for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER re Remaining Downs-Wells Fargo Discovery Dispute. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER - ( See PDF Order for details and specifics ) Affidavit/declaration due by 10/31/2014. "Administration Manual" due by 10/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER - Wells Fargo's # 261 Motion to clarify is GRANTED consistent with this order; Defendant's # 262 Request for expedited relief is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER on 257 Remand. Joint statement/separate memoranda due within 20 days (by 10/14/2014). See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Plaintiff's objection to the Magistrate Judge's January 17, 2014 order 237 is remanded to the Magistrate Judge for determination of defendant Minnesota Life Company's compliance with prior discovery orders. Plain iff's objection to the Magistrate Judge's March 12, 2014 order 244 is sustained. Plaintiff's motion to compel 222 is remanded to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER denying 222 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 03/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 224 Motion to Preclude Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ADDENDUM TO # 232 ORDER. (See pdf Order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER The court grants the relief sought in Motion to Strike 226 , but declines to strike the document 223 itself. The court denies as moot Request for Expedited Relief on Order Shortening Time 227 . The court denies Motion to Compel 223 . Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/17/14. Please see attached for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying without prejudice 181 , 188 , and 191 Motions. Within 30 days of the entry of this order the parties shall file any similar motions should they decide to proceed with similar motions in this matter (due by 1/9/2014). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with attached order. Parties shall file a joint proposed pretrial order within 30 days. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER denying 209 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting 155 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Minnesota Life Insurance Company and against plaintiff Linda Downs on plaintiff Linda Downs's first cause of action for intentional i nfliction of emotional distress; second cause of action for negligent infliction of emotional distress; third cause of action for breach of contract; fourth cause of action for breach of the implied covenants of good faith and fair dealing; fifth cau se of action for violation of Nevada's Unfair Claim Practices Act; seventh cause of action for negligence; and ninth cause of action for unjust enrichment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 08/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER DENYING without prejudice Defendant's 137 Motion to dissolve stipulated injunction. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 07/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 197 / 198 Motion for Stay of Discovery. If motions for summary judgment filed by Defendants are denied, then such Defendant will have 21 days to submit response to Plaintiff's motions to compel 188 and 191 . If under this order a responsive memorandum is required, prior to filing memorandum the parties shall first "meet and confer". Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING Minnesota Life's # 123 Motion for Protective Order, and # 124 Motion to Strike P's Designation of Dr. Antonucciio as Testifying Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/1/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying without prejudice 129 Motion to Compel and granting 130 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/29/13. Please see attached for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 PROTECTIVE ORDER on 87 Stipulation re Confidential Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/10/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 50 Motion to shorten time : P's Response to # 49 Motion due by Friday, 4/20/2012. A hearing on the # 49 Motion shall take place at 1:30 P.M. ON WEDNESDAY, APRIL 25, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation. Plaintiff and defendants, River City Group, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and MTC Financial, Inc. stipulate and agree that defendants shall refrain from conducting a trustee's sale of the property located at 320 Rebecca Drive, Sparks, NV. 89436. Further stipulated that plaintiff's 12 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction is WITHDRAWN without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/9/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. River City Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Downs
Represented By: Adam P. McMillen
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC FINANCIAL INC., dba TRUSTEE CORPS
Represented By: Richard J. Reynolds
Represented By: Michael E Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Represented By: Todd D Erb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Group LLC
Represented By: Christina S Bhirud
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Christina S Bhirud
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?