Gadsden et al v. Carpenter et al
Plaintiff: Chioke Gadsden and Nathan Peterson
Defendant: Tara Carpenter, Stephen Clark, James Greg Cox, Ellie Emmanuel, Jack Palmer and Kirk Widmar
Case Number: 3:2012cv00098
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying ECF No. 147 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/03/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying ECF No. 137 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion to Strike : P's # 44 Request for judicial notice is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/14/2013 granting 22 Motion to Compel and granting 23 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants shall provide responses to plaintiffs' discovery requests served on 11/1/2012 on or before Monday, 2/4/2013. Parties have to and including Thursday, 2/14/2013 to file dispositive motions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Amending 4 Screening Order. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/20/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadsden et al v. Carpenter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Carpenter
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Clark
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greg Cox
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellie Emmanuel
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Palmer
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Widmar
Represented By: Troy C Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chioke Gadsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?