National Council of La Raza et al v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Las Vegas Branch of the NAACP (Branch 1111), National Council of La Raza and Reno-Sparks Branch of the NAACP (Branch 1112)
Defendant: Ross Miller and Michael Willden
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General, State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2012cv00316
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 127 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Attorney Fees and Costs ECF No. 117 is granted consistent with the reasoning in this order. Plaintiffs are entitled to fees in the amount of $523,475.61 and costs in the amount of $27,036.34. The Clerk is directed to enter judgement in favor of Plaintiffs and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order 122 ORDER granting ECF No. 118 Motion for Substitution of Defendants : Barbara Cegavske substituted for Ross Miller. Richard Whitley substituted for Michael Willden. Senior Deputy AG Lori M. Story is counsel for Ds Ceegavske and Whitley; AG is not an "Interested Party" Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/20/20116. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order 114 ORDER granting 113 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 88 ORDER vacating 70 order of dismissal and directing the parties to file joint status report within 10 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order 82 ORDER - The undersigned elects as a senior judge of the court to decline the assignment entered on September 3, 2015 and refers the case to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order 70 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Complaint 1 is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Council of La Raza et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Branch of the NAACP (Branch 1111)
Represented By: Anson Asaka
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Jamie Halavais
Represented By: Kim Keenan
Represented By: Bob Kengle
Represented By: Alan A Martinson
Represented By: David Rubino
Represented By: Michelle Rupp
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Council of La Raza
Represented By: Anson Asaka
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Jamie Halavais
Represented By: Kim Keenan
Represented By: Bob Kengle
Represented By: Alan A Martinson
Represented By: David Rubino
Represented By: Michelle Rupp
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno-Sparks Branch of the NAACP (Branch 1112)
Represented By: Anson Asaka
Represented By: Sarah Brannon
Represented By: Jamie Halavais
Represented By: Kim Keenan
Represented By: Bob Kengle
Represented By: Alan A Martinson
Represented By: David Rubino
Represented By: Michelle Rupp
Represented By: Neil Steiner
Represented By: W. Chris Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Miller
Represented By: K. Kevin Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Willden
Represented By: K. Kevin Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General, State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?