MDL No. 2357 - IN RE: Zappos.com, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation

Plaintiff: Brooke C. Brown, Tara J. Elliott, Ms. Dahlia Habashy, Stacy Penson, Stephanie Priera, Robert Ree, Josh Richards, Christa Seal, Shari Simon, Mrs. Sylvia St. Lawrence, Theresa D. Stevens and Kathryn Vorhoff
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., dba Zappos.com
In Re: Zappos.com, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00325
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2018 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re ECF No. 298 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Opinion. A Status Conference is set for 5/14/2018 at 9:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2018 at 5:00 PM. Out-of-state counsel who request telephonic appearances shall file a Request to Appear Telephonically by 5/4/2018 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 29, 2016 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 282 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 281 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Amended Complaint due by 9/12/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 6, 2016 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 254 Motion to Dismiss; granting ECF No. 255 Motion to Strike ; granting ECF Nos. 244 , 248 , and 266 Motions to Seal; and granting ECF No. 275 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 3, 2016 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 264 Stipulation re 254 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint and 255 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Class Allegations. Responses due by 2/3/2016. Replies due by 3/2/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 1, 2015 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without prejudice 217 Motion to Dismiss, granting Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaints; denying as moot 219 Motion to Strike; granting 218 Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 27, 2015 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 207 Motion to Enforce Settlement; granting Plaintiffs' 206 Motion to Seal; granting Zappos's 210 Motion to Seal; denying as moot Zappos's 214 Motion Request for Oral A rgument; granting Plaintiffs' 220 and 223 Motions for Extension of Time - Plaintiffs' responses to 217 Motion to Dismiss and 219 Motion to Strike are due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 18, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 122 Motion to Dismiss and 124 Motion to Strike; granting 191 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 9, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 171 Supplemental case management report. The third and final communication to this limited group of Zappos' customers shall be sent by regular mail, and the parties shall revise Exhibit 2 to the supplemental case management report 171 accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
September 9, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 80 , 87 , 97 , and 99 Motions for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 69 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED on the following basis. Plaintiffs shall have until February 14, 2013 to file oppositions to the # 62 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures by February 14, 2013. Zappos.com, Inc's reply shall be filed by March 8, 2013, and the parties shall establish the ESI Protocol by March 8, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 19, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Seal; granting 45 Motion for Leave to File Applications for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel. (Applications due by 1/4/2013.) Previous order in 2:12-cv-182 (#10) VACATED with respect to appointment of lead counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) Modified on 12/21/2012 to clarify(JC).
September 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Applies to this case and all member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 6, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the parties shall have up to an including August 30, 2012 within which to submit their joinders or oppositions to Zappos' # 3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. Replies shall be due on September 6, 2012. F URTHER ORDERED that oral argument regarding Zappos' # 3 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action is set for Wednesday, September 19, 2012 at 9:00am. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Zappos' # 2 Motion to Transfer and Plaintiffs Stephanie Priera, Robert Ree, Shari Simon, and Kathryn Vorhoff's # 4 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 16, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) - MDL No. 2357 : (See Attached Schedule re: Northern District of California Tag-Along Action 3:12-cv-03131; Nobles v. Zappos.com, Inc.)The action on the attached schedule is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § ;1407 to the District of Nevada for the reasons stated in the order of June 13, 2012, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robert Clive Jones. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, July 6, 2012(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 14, 2012 1 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER - MDL No. 2357 : ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A (attached) and pending outside the District of Nevada are transferred to the District of Nevada and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robert Clive Jones for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDL No. 2357 - IN RE: Zappos.com, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., dba Zappos.com
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Bell
Represented By: Lisa Catherine DeJaco
Represented By: Christine R. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Brian C. Frontino
Represented By: Mithoo Robert Malani
Represented By: Robert R. McCoy
Represented By: Irene Oria
Represented By: Scott M. Pearson
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Represented By: Alisa M. Taormina
Represented By: Raleigh C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke C. Brown
Represented By: Jones Ward PLC
Represented By: E. Kirk Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara J. Elliott
Represented By: Jones Ward PLC
Represented By: E. Kirk Wood, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart Wade H. Yeoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Dahlia Habashy
Represented By: D. Greg Blankinship
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Carton
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Penson
Represented By: Jason R. Alderman
Represented By: Howard M. Bushman
Represented By: Eric C Deters
Represented By: Lance At Harke
Represented By: Charles T. Lester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Priera
Represented By: Brent A Carson
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: James L Kauffman
Represented By: Peter Mougey
Represented By: Robert A Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ree
Represented By: Marc L. Godino
Represented By: William M. O'Mara
Represented By: David C OMara
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Richards
Represented By: Tamra Carsten Givens
Represented By: J. Andrew Meyer
Represented By: Rachel Soffin
Represented By: Scott Wm. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa Seal
Represented By: Jones Ward PLC
Represented By: E. Kirk Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari Simon
Represented By: Douglas G Blankinship
Represented By: Brent A Carson
Represented By: Jeffrey I Carton
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: James L Kauffman
Represented By: Peter Mougey
Represented By: Robert A Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Sylvia St. Lawrence
Represented By: David H. Charlip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa D. Stevens
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Richard L. Coffman
Represented By: Mark K. Gray
Represented By: Erich P. Schork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Vorhoff
Represented By: Douglas G Blankinship
Represented By: Brent A Carson
Represented By: Jeffrey I Carton
Represented By: Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Represented By: James L Kauffman
Represented By: Peter Mougey
Represented By: Robert A Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Zappos.com, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?