May 18, 2016 |
Filing
189
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice per ECF No. 188 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 1, 2016 |
Filing
176
ORDER denying without prejudice # 175 Motion re exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
168
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 2/5/2016, granting Plaintiff's 163 Motion. Defendants' counsel shall add a "clean" copy of the VanHorn declaration to the court's and parties' exhibit binders. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) (Main Document 168 replaced on 2/5/2016; NEF regenerated) (KR).
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
161
ORDER DENYING without prejudice # 159 Motion. The court instructs the parties to discuss at their meeting on January 12, 2016, how production of the medical records will be handled for trial. ( See pdf order for specifics. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing
155
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 12/15/2015, denying 154 Motion Concerning Individual Pretrial Order. Hearing re Joint Pretrial Order set for 12/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. The Office of the Attorney General shall arrange for the Plaintiff to be present by telephone and shall contact the courtroom administrator, Katie Lynn Ogden, at (775) 686-5758 or Katie_Ogden@nvd.uscou rts.gov, at least two (2) days prior to the hearing to advise her of the number where Plaintiff may be reached at the time of the hearing. Counsel for Defendants shall submit a copy of the most recent draft Joint Pretrial Order to the court in advance of the hearing. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing
144
ORDER denying 143 Motion for Production of Video Tapes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
121
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/28/2015, denying as moot Plaintif's 120 Motion for Clarification. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
117
ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Defendants' # 88 Motion for leave to file medical documents under seal is granted; # 116 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's # 75 Disp ositive Motion is denied; Defendants' # 89 Motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part (see pdf order for specifics), and claims remain for trial as specified herein. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 30, 2014 |
Filing
113
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/30/2014, denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion Seeking Not to be Transferred From HDSP. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
107
ORDER GRANTING IN PART # 106 Motion to Extend Time : Response to # 89 Motion for summary judgment due by 9/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
66
ORDER granting 64 motion to amend complaint. The clerk shall file the second amended complaint. AG's Office to advise within 14 days regarding service (by 3/12/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 14, 2014 |
Filing
61
ORDER granting 60 motion for reconsideration. The 56 Order is amended as follows (see order for details). If Plaintiff chooses to refile his motion to amend, he must do so on or before 2/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 01/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
59
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 1/10/2014, granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Extend Time to Review Medical Files. Plaintiff shall have an additional three hours within which to review his medical files under the terms and conditions outlined in attached order. Please see attached for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER - Plaintiff's # 37 motion is DENIED as moot. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a copy of the docket in this matter. ( PACER docket electronically transmitted to P at NNCC 11/19/2013. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 11/19/2013 to reflect electronic transmittal of docket sheet (DRM).
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
23
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 5/1/2013, denying 20 Motion to Stay. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
18
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/12/2013, DENYING Plaintiff's 17 Motion to Compel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|