Phillips v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Phillips
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00344
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2015 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 317 Motion to Seal; denying without prejudice 326 Motion to Enforce Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 10, 2015 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 245 , 279 , 282 , and 287 Motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 21, 2015 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Motions in Limine (## 199 , 200 , 214 , 218 ), the Motion to Bifurcate Trial (# 243 ), and the Motion to Seal (# 244 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORD that the Motions in Limine (## 195 , 205 , 217 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DE NIED IN PART. FURTHER ORD that the Motions in Limine (## 196 , 197 , 198 , 201 , 202 , 203 , 204 , 206 , 207 , 208 , 209 , 211 , 212 , 213 , 215 , 216 , 219 , 220 , 221 , 222 , 223 , 224 , 225 , 226 , 227 , 228 ) are DENIED. FURTHER ORD that the Motion in Limine (## 261 , 262 ) is STRICKEN as untimely. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 16, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 161 , 164 , 168 , and 171 Motions in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion for Summary Judgment (see order for details); granting 162 , 165 , 169 , 186 , and 188 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 26, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Troy Brenes and Peter Wetherall (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Richard North and Justin Hepworth; FTR #: 10:06:29 a.m. - 10:38:14 a.m. / 10:46:55 a.m. - 10:57:38 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. Defendants' 145 Motion to Seal and Plaintiff's 149 Motion to Seal are GRANTE D. Defendants' 143 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. The court grants leave to take the deposition of Mr. Weiland past the discovery deadline of April 18, 2014. See order for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
February 19, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED Bard's # 141 Motion to Seal is GRANTED and the following documents submitted in support of Plaintiff's opposition to Bards motion for protective order regarding the deposition of John H. Weiland (Doc. # 129 -1) are hereby ordered SEALED: (see pdf order for specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 7, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING deposition of Mr. Weiland, currently scheduled for January 13, 2014 pending conclusion of briefing re 126 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order. Responses due by 1/17/2014. Replies due by 1/24/2014. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 7, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 29, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BARD'S ASSERTION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND WORK PRODUCT DOCTRINE AS TO FORTY-THREE JOINT SELECTION DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 20, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 78 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 13, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/13/2013, granting 79 Motion to Seal; denying as moot 55 Motion to Seal. Please see attached for further details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 1, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 3, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to reschedule the case management conference. Case Management Conference is vacated. Counsel for Defendants shall coordinate a joint conference call with Plaintiff's counsel and Courtroom Administrator, Katie Ogden ( 775-686-5758), no later than Wednesday, October 10,2012, to schedule the case management conference to be held within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/03/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Phillips
Represented By: Peter C Wetherall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?