395 Lampe, LLC v. Desert Ranch, LLLP et al

Plaintiff: 395 Lampe, LLC
Defendant: Timothy L Blixseth and Desert Ranch, LLLP
Case Number: 3:2012cv00358
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED Ds' # 10 Motion to stay in case 3:12-cv-0358 is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the Washington state court action. Ds shall, within 10 days after resolution of that action, file a notice of resolution of the Washington state court action and a motion to lift the stay with the court. FURTHER ORDERED that D's motion to stay in case 3:12-cv-0385 (#6) is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending resolution of the Washington state court action. Ds shall, w ithin 10 days after resolution of that action, file a notice of resolution of the Washington state court action and a motion to lift the stay with the court. FURTHER ORDERED that Ds' # 20 Motion to extend time to file a counterclaim in case no. 3:12-cv-0358 and motion to extend time to file a counterclaim in case no. 3:12-cv-0385 (#12) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. 3:12-cv-358-LRH-WGC shall be the base case, and 3:12-cv-385-HDM-VPC shall be the member case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 30, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 13 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 3, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 Ex Parte Motion for extension of time : Ds' responsive pleading due by 7/24/2012 : Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 395 Lampe, LLC v. Desert Ranch, LLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 395 Lampe, LLC
Represented By: Austin Kent Sweet
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L Blixseth
Represented By: Dennis N Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Ranch, LLLP
Represented By: Dennis N Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?