June 13, 2014 |
Filing
309
ORDER denying 122 and 163 motions for sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 161 motion for sanctions. Plaintiff shall within 14 days file a Declaration submitting a Memorandum of Costs itemizing his "reasonable ex penses" incurred relating to all filings he submitted with respect to 121 , 160 , and 226 motions. The Defendants will have 10 days thereafter to file any objection. (Declaration due by 6/27/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing
304
ORDERED that Fernandez's # 211 Objection is OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing
290
DOCKETING ERROR - DUPLICATE RE # 289 - DISREGARD THIS ENTRY ORDER - Plaintiff's # 286 Motion to compel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 5/28/2014 to reflect DOCKET ERROR(DRM).
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing
287
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 285 Motion for Review of Mental Health and Medical Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing
280
ORDER - The parties are directed to address spoliation issues as more specifically delineated in this order. ( Referencing # 151 MOTION for Sanctions. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 7, 2014 |
Filing
278
ORDER overruling 233 OBJECTION re 227 Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
261
ORDERED that Fernandez's # 180 Objection is SUSTAINED. This matter shall be remanded to the Magistrate Judge in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
260
ORDER overruling Fernandez's 174 Objections. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 02/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing
255
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 1/24/2014, denying as moot Plaintiff's 254 motion to clarify. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 16, 2014 |
Filing
256
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Discovery Status Conference held on 1/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Kevin Fernandez, In Pro Per (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Nathan H astings (Telephonically); FTR #: 10:02:37 a.m. - 12:31:03 p.m.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. Plaintiff's 249 Notice to Defendants of DSM and NCI Pages to Photocopy Pursuant to Court's Order has been resolved; no further action is necessary. Plaintiff's 250 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental to #248 Memorandum is Response to #246 Order is GRANTED; the court finds good cause for defendants to produce a legible "work schedule." Plaintiff's 160 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See attached order for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
246
ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 238 Motion for Reconsideration. In view of the impending hearing on December 11, 2013, and the directive to Plaintiff at lines 22-24 of the preceding page, counsel for Defendants is requested to secure expedited delivery of a copy of this order to plaintiff by either fax or email to Ely State Prison. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
244
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 12/4/2013, denying as moot Plaintiff's 240 Motion to Clarify. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
239
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 11/14/2013, denying as moot 232 Motion to Compel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
October 1, 2013 |
Filing
227
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 226 Motion to Compel Supplemental Interrogatory Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/01/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
220
ORDER denying without prejudice 167 Motion for Court to Order Defendants to Produce a Martinez Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing
217
ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's # 116 Report and Recommendation is adopted and accepted; P's Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and the Clerk of the Court shall FILE the Amended Compla int as specified herein. ( See pdf order for numerous details and specifics. ) P is given until 10/18/2013 to file a second amended if he believes he can correct the noted deficiencies. Clerk shall SEND to P a blank section 1983 form with instructions along with one copy of the original Complaint and one copy of the Amended Complaint. ( Form and docs mailed to P 9/18/2013. ) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 13, 2013 |
Filing
213
ORDER overruling Plaintiff's 48 , 81 , and 89 Objections. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing
205
ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot Plaintiff's 202 Motion to Extend Time. Replies as to 159 , 160 , 164 , and 167 Motions due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 22, 2013 |
Filing
200
ORDER denying without prejudice 142 Motion to Amend, 153 Motion to Serve New Defendants, and 179 Motion for Leave to Add Additional Pages; denying as moot 121 Motion to Compel, 123 Motion to Exceed Number of Interrogatories and 165 Motion for Enlargement of Time; denying 122 , 151 , 161 and 163 Motions for Sanctions; granting to the extent as noted in attached order 181 Motion to Increase Copy Fee Limit and 182 Motion for Leave to Depart from the Provisions of LR 26-7; granting 191 Motion to Withdraw; and granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion to Compel. Please see attached for specific details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
June 12, 2013 |
Filing
173
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/12/2013, denying as moot 171 Motion to Extend Time and granting 172 Motion for Status Conference. The courtroom deputy shall schedule a status co nference. Briefing on motions 151 , 152 , 153 , 159 , 160 , 161 , 162 , 163 , 164 , 165 , 166 , 167 , and 168 and on any additional motions filed by Plaintiff prior to status conference are STAYED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
141
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/11/2013, GRANTING Defendants' 135 Motion to Stay. All further proceedings, including discovery, are STAYED pending completion of the global settlement conference. Counsel for defendant shall file a notice with the court after the conclusion of the settlement conference advising the court if the settlement conference was successful or not. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
128
ORDER adopting and accepting 97 and 98 Reports and Recommendations. Motion for TRO 5 and Motion for Preliminary Injunction 6 are DENIED. Motion for Order Granting Judicial Intervention and Injunctive Relief Compelling Defendants to Allow Plaintiff Adequate Access to Law Library 17 DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
112
ORDER denying 72 -1 MOTION to File Amended Complaint Under Seal. Clerk to un-seal proposed amended complaint 72 -3. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
101
ORDER DENYING P's 68 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 13, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER DENYING 82 Motion for Clerk to serve subpoenas. The Clerk shall issue 4 blank subpoenas and send them to P. The Clerk shall also send P a copy of the docket sheet in this case. ( 4 blank issued subpoenas (AO Form 88B) and copy of PACER docket sheet mailed to P 2/14/2012. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/13/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/13/2012 (DRM).
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER GRANTING 28 , 38 , 46 Motions for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/16/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
35
ORDER - P's 21 Motion for issuance and service of summons is GRANTED. Clerk shall issue Summons for D Robert Schober. FURTHER ORD Clerk shall provide USM w copy this Order and the summons for D. Robert Schober. ( Summons and Order to USM, t ogether with # 10 address UNDER SEAL, on 9/18/2012. ) FURTHER ORD Clerk shall SEND P a USM-285 form; a copy of # 4 Complaint; and a copy of this Order. ( Docs mailed to P 9/18/2012. ) FURTHER ORD P shall have 20 days to complete the USM-285 and deliver it to USM for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|