Toavs v. Bannister et al
Plaintiff: |
Berton G. Toavs |
Defendant: |
Robert Bannister, Marsha Johns, David Mar and Johnathan Peery |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00449 |
Filed: |
August 23, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
104
ORDER accepting and adopting 95 Report and Recommendation and denying 91 "Motion for 60 b. Fraud and Misrepresentation of Facts". Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
96
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Take Video Deposition of Defendant John Peery; denying as moot 94 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - # 73 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Defendants' # 47 Motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part as specified herein. Pl aintiff's # 60 Cross-motion for summary judgment is denied. Further ordered that Plaintiff's # 78 Motion to strike is granted : Defendants' # 77 Response to Plaintiff's objections and Plaintiff's # 79 Response to Defendants response to Plaintiff's objections are stricken. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER adopting and accepting 45 Report and Recommendation; denying Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
42
ORDER denying without prejudice 34 Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a new motion for leave to amend (due by 3/20/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 30, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER Clerk shall electronically serve copy of this order and copy of complaint 5 on AG's Office (served via NEF / NEF regeneration 8/30/13). Within 21 days, AG's Office shall file notice re acceptance of service (see attach ed for details). If AG accepts service for any defendants, answer due within 60 days. Henceforth, plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copy of every document submitted to the court. Please see attached for specific details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
18
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING in its entirety 17 Report and Recommendation; DENYING Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?