September 5, 2019 |
Filing
391
ORDER striking ECF No. 390 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing
387
ORDER re ECF Nos. 381 , 386 Notices of Bankruptcy, staying case pending resolution of Defendants' bankruptcy petitions or until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
373
AMENDED JUDGMENT - Judgment is entered in favor of the plaintiff Companion Property and Casualty Group and against defendants Sky High, LLC, and Sky High Sports Orange County Operations, LLC, in the amount of $3,485,000.00, together with prejudg ment interest in the amount of $253,825.81, attorney's fees in the amount of $109,538.18, costs in the amount of $34,228.20, and postjudgment interest at the legal rate. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
357
ORDER Sky High's ex parte # 356 Motion for an order shortening time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a response to Sky High's # 355 Motion to quash writs of execution on or before Monday, November 16, 2015, and Sky High shall file any reply on or before Wednesday, November 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 29, 2015 |
Filing
332
ORDER granting 331 Stipulation : Response to 327 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs due by Friday 11/6/2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
325
JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff Companion Property and Casualty Group and against defendants Sky High LLC and Sky High Sports Orange County Operations LLC in the amount of $3,485,000.00, together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $248,127.23 and postjudgment interest at the legal rate. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 21, 2015 |
Filing
315
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (Day Five) held on 9/21/2015 before Judge Howard D. McKibben. Crtrm Administrator: Paris Rich; Plaintiff's Counsel: Gina Mushmeche and Jordan Schnitzer; Defendants' Counsel: Day Willia ms and Natalia Vander Laan; Court Reporter: Kathryn French; Time of Hearing: 8:30 AM to 5:07 PM; Courtroom: 4;See attached Minutes. Jury Verdicts entered. IT IS ORDERED, the Plaintiff shall prepare a proposed Judgment consistent with the findings of the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
234
ORDER FOR PREPARATION OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
223
ORDER - Absent objection from Highpoint on or before March 6, 2015, the court will sign and enter plaintiff's proposed order (# 122 Reply Ex. A) and direct that the settlement of the parties be reduced to judgment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
220
ORDER re Plaintiff's 212 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Defendant Highpoint Risk Services' opposition due by 2/18/2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
217
ORDER re # 215 MOTION to Extend Time : The court will set a date for the opposition to be filed after consideration of the motion to withdraw and the designation of new counsel. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
210
ORDER Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 170 is denied. Faust's motion for summary judgment 165 is granted as to plaintiff's claims of breach of fiduciary duty, constructive fraud and detriment al reliance and is denied in all other respects.Sky High's motion for summary judgment 168 is granted as to plaintiff's claim of detrimental reliance and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 2, 2014 |
Filing
169
ORDER DENYING 166 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's # 167 Motion for partial summary judgment in excess of 30 pages is STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall have up to and including January 7, 2014, in which to file a motion for summary judgment in compliance with LR 7-4. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
122
ORDER denying 103 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and denying as moot 121 Motion for Leave to File Supplement. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
May 28, 2013 |
Filing
64
ORDER - RPS and CAP defendants' motions to dismiss (# 14 , # 15 ) are DENIED AS MOOT; the motions to dismiss (# 48 , # 49 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renew as a motion for summary judgment at the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 5/28/2013 for spelling (DRM).
|
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER Amended Complaint deadline: 3/27/2013. Should plaintiff fail to file amended complaint, pending motions to dismiss shall stand submitted. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 18, 2013 |
Filing
25
ORDER - Defendant's 23 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED . Said defendants shall have up to and including 1/29/2013 in which to file their reply. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants Risk Placement Services, Inc., Joan Vascones, and Gloria Lams shall have up to and including 1/18/13 in which to file their reply.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
|