Estes v. LaGrande et al
Petitioner: |
Donald Glenn Estes |
Respondent: |
LaGrande and Nevada Attorney General |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00072 |
Filed: |
February 14, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER that the Clerk is directed to substitute Renee Baker for Robert LeGrand, on the docket for this case; that the First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ECF No. 21 is denied; that the Petitioner is granted a certificate of appealabil ity with regard to Ground 1 of his first amended petition for writ of habeas corpus; Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability in all other respects; Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is to place under seal Respondents' Exhibit 1, which is located in the record for this case at ECF No. 36 . Respondentsare to file as a new exhibit (Respondents' Exhibit 2) a copy of the transcript of Estes' statement to the police with Estes' date of birth and Social Security number redacted by 7/1/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
July 22, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying respondents' 25 motion to dismiss Grounds 1 and 2 of the amended petition; directing respondents to file an answer to the 20 / 21 amended petition within 30 days (due 8/21/2014). Petitioner shall reply 30 days thereafte r. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to the staff attorneys in Reno, NV. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
9
ORDERED that counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. FURTHER ORD amended petition due by 9/4/2013. FURTHER ORD that, if and when respondents file an answer, petitioner shall have 30 days after service of the answer to file and serve a reply. FURTHER ORD that all state court record exhibits filed by the parties herein shall be filed with an index of exhibits as specified herein. FURTHER ORD that the parties shall send courtesy paper copies of all exhibits to the Reno Staff Attorney. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?