Herron v. Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Herron
Defendant: Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00075
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 16 and 22 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's retaliation claim is stricken. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Defendant's # 3 Motion to dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before September 16, 2013. Should plaintiff fail to file an amended complaint, the defendant's 3 Motion to dismiss will be granted. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Herron
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Represented By: R. Calder Huntington
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?