Cochrane v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Terry R. Cochrane
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2013cv00077
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 11/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Petitioner's ECF No. 49 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER - petitioner's ## 23 , 34 Motions to extend his prison copywork limit are granted : petitioner's copywork limit shall be increased by at least $10.00 ( Copy of order mailed to NDOC Inmate Services on 3/25/2015. ); petitio ner's # 35 Motion requesting permission to file is denied; petitioner's # 36 Motion for submission is granted; petitioner's # 37 Motion asking Court to set a time limit to file reply is granted; petitioner's # 41 Motion for a stay to exhaust a ground is denied; petitioner shall file and serve a reply to the answer by 5/24/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw; striking 17 Motion for Stay; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents shall file and serve an answer to the remaining grounds of the petition within 30 days (by 3/30/2014). Petitioner shall reply within 30 days after being served with the answer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 6 Motion to Extend Copy Work, to the extent that petitioner seeks photocopies in order to prepare, serve, and file a response to the pending motion to dismiss; GRANTING Petitioner's 14 Motion to Extend Time re 8 Motion to Dismiss. Petitioner's response shall be filed on or before July 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall file and electronically serve the petition on the respondents. (Service completed 5/14/13). Respondents shall have 45 days to answer, or oth erwise respond to, petition. FURTHER ORDERED any state court record exhibits filed by respondents shall be filed with separate index. Hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to staff attorneys in Re no. FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Petitioner to serve defendants copy of every pleading, motion, or document submitted for consideration by the court. Petitioner shall include with original paper submitted for filing a certificate of mailing. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochrane v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry R. Cochrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?