McIntyre v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Richard Clifford McIntyre
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2013cv00079
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - Petitioner's # 16 Motion for counsel is denied. Further ordered Petitioner's # 15 Motion to stay ruling is denied. Further ordered Respondents' # 7 Motion to dismiss is granted. (see pdf order for specifics re Grounds 4 and 5) Further ordered answer due by 5/10/2014; reply due 45 days after service of answer. Further ordered no action need be taken on petitioner's # 24 Motion for clarification. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing that from this date forward, the hard copy of any exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntyre v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Clifford McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?