Avendano et al v. Security Consultants Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Issac Avendano and Rolando Duenas
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc., Securitas Security Services USA, Inc., Security Consultants Group, Inc., United Government Security Officers of America, International Union and United Government Security Officers of America, Local 283
Case Number: 3:2013cv00168
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Show Cause Hearing set for 4/20/2016 at 9:00 AM at which time the parties shall show cause as to why the court should not enter judgment in accordance with the settlement terms reached by the parties at the settlement conference. The participants shall only appear telephonically by calling AT&T no later than 5 minutes prior to the hearing at 1(888)684-8852 with Access Code 5816466 and Security Code 0420. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 30, 2016 265 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Hearing Re: Stipulated Settlement and 173 Union Defendants' Objections to Magistrate's Orders held on 3/30/2016 before Judge Howard D. McKibben. Crtrm Administrator: Paris Rich; Plaintiffs' ; Counsel: John Tucker, Esq. and Rachel Baldridge, Esq.; Defendants' Counsel: Margaret Foley, Esq. for Security Consultants Group, Inc., Paragon Systems, Inc., and Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.; Robert Kapitan, Esq. and Michael Langton, Esq. for Union Defendants; Court Reporter: Kathryn French; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM to 9:42 AM; Courtroom: 4; See attached Minutes and Orders. IT IS ORDERED, stipulation for dismissal shall be due to the Court no later than Friday, 4/8/2016 at 12:00 PM. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
October 15, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defendants to file a response to 238 Motion to Seal, no later than October 21, 2015, that sets out compelling reasons justifying the sealing of exhibits. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 7, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re # 231 Sealed Exhibits : Plaintiffs shall file a motion to seal no later than October 14, 2015. Failure to file a motion to seal no later than October 14, 2015, may result in an order unsealing the exhibits. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 29, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to strike documents 211 - 222 ; allowing plaintiffs until 10/2/2015 to re-file one response in opposition to each motion for summary judgment on behalf of each plaintiff (see order for details). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 16, 2015 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING # 203 Motion to consolidate reply briefs and file excess pages. Plaintiffs shall have until September 23, 2015, to file their separate response briefs to the motions for summary judgment (## 200 , 201 , 202 ) in accordance with the 30-page limit of Local Rule 7-4. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2015 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING # 195 Stipulation; # 196 Unopposed Motion : Dispositive Motions due by 8/12/2015. Responses due by 9/18/2015. No further extension will be permitted. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 13, 2015 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting # 184 Motion Excuse Attorney Robert Kapitan From Attendance at May 14, 2015 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 10, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 167 Stipulation to vacate case management conference. The court will address the parties' stipulation to extend discovery deadline 166 at the case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
April 2, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 133 Motion for Attorney Fees. Union defendants shall pay to plaintiffs $118,720.59 in attorney fees and costs as a penalty for the conduct of their attorney, Robert B. Kapitan, as described in the court's December 2, 2014 order 124 . This order is STAYED until Monday, April 20, 2015. Pursuant to LR IB 3-1(a), a party may file with the District Court an objection to this order within fourteen days of service of the order. If objections are filed, this stay shall remain in effect until the District Court issues its ruling on the objection(s). If no objections are filed, the effective date of this order shall be Tuesday, April 21, 2015. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
December 18, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 12/18/2014, granting 121 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall place documents 109 -1 and 109 -2 under seal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 2, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting reasonable attorney fees to plaintiff; directing plaintiffs to file within 21 days a motion describing fees and costs as indicated; referring this order to the Disciplinary Counsel of the Ohio Supreme Court and di recting Clerk to send them a copy (mailed 12/2/2015); directing Kapitan to send a copy of this order and a copy of each paper and exhibit cited herein to the ODC and to timely file notice of compliance; directing Kapitan to co mply with any ODC investigation, review, and disciplinary action; declining at this time plaintiffs' request to preclude Kapitan from continuing his representation of union defendants. Both plaintiffs and defendants are warned that t he time for gamesmanship has passed. The court will have no further patience for delay, misrepresentations, and violations of applicable rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 19, 2014 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Strike: striking paragraph four of the 109 -1 Sullivan affidavit, striking in its entirety the 109 -2 Sullivan affidavit's e-mail exhibit. Aside from these exceptions, the 114 Motion to Strike is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 12, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for union defendants Robert B. Kapitan to file a brief within 21 days to show cause why he and/or union defendants should not be sanctioned for knowingly making repeated misrepresentations to this court. Plaintiffs may respond within 14 days thereafter. (Show Cause Response due by 10/3/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 2, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' United Government Security Officers of America and United Government Security Officers of America, Local 283 motion to disqualify plaintiffs' counsel 47 is DENIED; plaintiffs' motion for leave to file document fo r in camera review 76 is DENIED as moot; defendants' United Government Security Officers of America and United Government Security Officers of America, Local 283 motion to strike exhibits 10 and 11 from plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to disqualify 82 is GRANTED. These two exhibits are hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
May 6, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 1, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 63 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default; and, GRANTING granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Answer, Instanter. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 28, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Court stays order 52 entered 1/28/2014 so that Ds may have an opportunity to file their objections to the Ps motion to file documents under seal 49 . Ds response to 49 due by 2/7/2014. Should Ps wish to file a reply it is due by 2/17/20 14. In light of this order, the time for Ps to file their response to the D's motion to disqualify 47 shall be extended 10 days after the court issues a final ruling on the Ps motion to file documents under seal 49 . Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
January 27, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 17 motion for a more definite statement; denying without prejudice 17 motion to dismiss defendants Paragon and Securitas. Amended Complaint due 2/14/2014. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 01/27/2014. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 01/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 Stipulation. The time for the Paragon Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended 10 days from July 1, 2013 to and including Thursday, July 11, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 07/01/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avendano et al v. Security Consultants Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Avendano
Represented By: Ian E Silverberg
Represented By: John A. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Duenas
Represented By: Ian E Silverberg
Represented By: John A. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Consultants Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Government Security Officers of America, International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Government Security Officers of America, Local 283
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?