Brian v. Windmill Ridge, LLC

Plaintiff: Rachel A. Brian
Defendant: Windmill Ridge, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00197
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Court's orders. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 19, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Plaintiff's failure to file a complaint by 6/3/2015 will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 30, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff to file a complaint within 30 days (due by 11/29/2013.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian v. Windmill Ridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel A. Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windmill Ridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?