Townsend v. Hebert et al

Defendant: Ms. Hebert, Dr. Mahakian, Willis and Witter
Plaintiff: John M. Townsend
Case Number: 3:2013cv00223
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court See 53 Notice for correct image. ORDER accepting and adopting 49 Report and Recommendation, granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment, and directing clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) Modified on 10/2/2015 (JC).
June 2, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 6/2/2015, granting 39 Motion to Seal. The 40 exhibits are filed and shall remain under seal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 11/12/2014, denying 29 Motion to Stay. Clerk shall send to plaintiff copy of amended complaint 5 , copy of screening order 8 , and copy of order 14 (sent 11/13/14 via NEF regeneration). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 25, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to e-serve a copy of this order and the 8 Screening Order on the AG's Office, Attn: Kat Howe (NEFs sent 7/25/2014). AG to advise court within 21 days regarding service (by 8/15/2014). Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Hebert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mahakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?