Tagle v. Baker et al

Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Petitioner: Victor Manuel Tagle
Case Number: 3:2013cv00318
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to strike ECF No. 21 Motion for Information. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion for Court Order. The Clerk shall not accept any other documents for filing in this action except a proper Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/5/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue as to this dismissal for failure to comply with the orders of the Court. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 08/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Manuel Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?