Rodney v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Kyle J. Rodney
Respondent: Warden Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2013cv00323
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - Petitioner shall file, within 45 days of the date of this order (8/27/2021), an opening brief in support of his claim that his procedural defaults should be excused under Martinez and that he is entitled to habeas relief on his remaining claims of ineffective assistance of counsel. Respondents shall have 45 days from the date petitioner's brief is filed to file a responsive brief. Petitioner shall thereafter have 30 days to file a reply brief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 60 days of entry of this Order and/or before Friday, July 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - The parties shall file a Joint Status Report with the Court on or before Monday, April 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting Petitioner's ECF No. 65 Motion for Discovery; denying without prejudice Petitioner's ECF No. 66 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; directing Petitioner to notify Court when outlined discovery is completed; directing each party to provide the other with all relevant medical records; granting Petitioner's ECF No. 67 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - The court will permit either party to file, within 60 days of the date of this order (2/21/2020), any motion relevant to, or in furtherance of, the remand of the court of appeals. Responses to any such motions will be due within 30 days of the date the motion is filed. The moving party will then have 20 days within which to file a reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ECF No. 33 is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly; a certificate of apealability is denied. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing Petitioner within 20 days to file a Notice of Abandonment of Unexhausted Claims or the ECF No. 33 Amended Petition will be dismissed; if claims are abandoned within time allowed, giving Respondents 30 days from filing date of the notice to respond to amended petition and giving Petitioner 20 days to reply; denying as moot Respondents' ECF No. 43 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss and denying 39 Motion to Strike. Petitioner shall have 20 days to file notice re unexhausted claims (see attached for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Motion for leave to amend 12 is denied without prejudice. Petitioner shall have 60 days to file motion for leave to amend (see attached for details). Motion to withdraw 23 is granted. Motion to dismiss 13 is wit hdrawn. Motion to seal 19 is granted. Motions for enlargement of time 11 , 24 and 25 are granted. Clerk shall send petitioner two copies of 2254 petition form with copy of instructions along with copy of original petition 7 and motion to amend 12 (mailed 2/19/14). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Clerk shall file and electronically serve the petition and motion for counsel on respondents (served 9/17/2013). Respondents to answer or otherwise respond to petition within 45 days. If an answer is filed, petitioner shall have 45 days to reply. Petitioner to serve respondents copy of every pleading, motion, or document submitted for consideration by the court. Petitioner shall include with original paper submitted for filing a certificate of mailing. Any state court record exhibits filed by respondents shall be filed with separate index. Hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to staff attorneys in Reno. The motion for counsel is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle J. Rodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?